The County of Sandoval v. McKinsey & Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: The County of Sandoval
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv09485
Filed: December 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2021 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of New Mexico; Case Number 1:21-cv-01115. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 8, 2021 Filing 7 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-17) by JPML (certified copy) transferring this matter to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1407; assigned to the Honorable Charles R. Breyer (MDL 2996). (bl)
December 8, 2021 MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 2996: New Mexico, 1:21-cv-01115, The County of Sandoval v. McKinsey & Company, Inc., Opened in California Northern District as 21-cv-09485-CRB pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 17 cc: JPMDL (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2021)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FINDING GOOD CAUSE TO DELAY SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. All instructions, deadlines and hearings in the Initial Scheduling Order (Doc. 3) are VACATED. The deadline for the parties to consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge remains in place. (kc)
November 22, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McKinsey & Company, Inc. (Montano, Larry)
November 22, 2021 Filing 4 Opposed MOTION to Stay Defendant's Motion for a Stay of Proceedings Pending Transfer for Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1407 and for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by McKinsey & Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Montano, Larry)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Joint Status Report due by 12/27/2021. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 1/5/2022 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The parties are to call Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Teleconference Line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 12/9/2021. (kc)
November 17, 2021 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by McKinsey & Company, Inc. from Thirteenth Judicial District Court, case number D-1329-CV-2021-01482. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by McKinsey & Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Errata A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Montano, Larry)
November 17, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7996379 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by McKinsey & Company, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Montano, Larry)
November 17, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (dr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The County of Sandoval v. McKinsey & Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The County of Sandoval
Represented By: Carlos E Sedillo
Represented By: Joshua K Conaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc.
Represented By: Larry J Montano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?