IT Casino Solutions, LLC v. TRANSIENT PATH, LLC et al
Plaintiff: IT CASINO SOLUTIONS, LLC, a California limited liability company and IT Casino Solutions, LLC
Defendant: TRANSIENT PATH, LLC, a limited liability company, Thomas M Calvin and Transient Path, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv09872
Filed: December 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2022 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: Counsel is instructed that all future filings shall bear the initials WHO immediately after the case number.Re: #33 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Thomas M Calvin, #32 First MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(1)-(3) & (6) filed by Thomas M Calvin, #31 Reply to Opposition/Response, filed by Transient Path, LLC (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2022)
February 14, 2022 Filing 33 Certificate of Interested Entities by Thomas M Calvin (Eddy, Michael) (Filed on 2/14/2022)
February 14, 2022 Filing 32 First MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(1)-(3) & (6) filed by Thomas M Calvin. Motion Hearing set for 3/30/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 2/28/2022. Replies due by 3/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Eddy, Michael) (Filed on 2/14/2022) Modified on 2/15/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
February 10, 2022 Filing 31 REPLY (re #15 First MOTION to Dismiss Pursant To Fed. Rule Civ. P. 12(B)(3) ) Reply to Plaintiff's Respone filed byTransient Path, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Eddy, Michael) (Filed on 2/10/2022)
February 10, 2022 Filing 30 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING - Motion Hearing as to #15 Motion to Dismiss reset for 3/30/2022 02:00 PM. This proceeding will be held via Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2022)
February 9, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE by IT Casino Solutions, LLC of Standing Orders (Attachments: #1 Standing Order All Judges, #2 Standing Order WHO Case Management Conference Order, #3 Standing Order WHO Civil Pretrial Order, #4 Standing Order Standing Civil Order, #5 Standing Order Administrative Motions to Seal)(Burton, Daphne) (Filed on 2/9/2022)
February 4, 2022 Filing 28 EXHIBITS J to Burton Declaration in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss (with title page) re: Docket No. #25 filed by IT Casino Solutions, LLC. (Burton, Daphne) (Filed on 2/4/2022) Modified on 2/7/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2022 #Electronic filing error. Exhibits e-filed separately and not as an attachment, require a title page. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4 re first page requirement. Please re-fi le in its entirety. Re: #27 Exhibits filed by IT Casino Solutions, LLC (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2022)
February 3, 2022 Filing 27 EXHIBITS J to Burton Declaration in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed byIT Casino Solutions, LLC. (Burton, Daphne) (Filed on 2/3/2022)
February 3, 2022 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Tim Irish in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by IT Casino Solutions, LLC. (Burton, Daphne) (Filed on 2/3/2022) Modified on 2/4/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2022 Filing 25 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #15 First MOTION to Dismiss Pursant To Fed. Rule Civ. P. 12(B)(3) ) with revised exhibits filed by IT Casino Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Risnoveanu Declaration, #2 Exhibit A-Risnoveanu Declaration, #3 Exhibit B-Risnoveanu Declaration, #4 Exhibit C-Risnoveanu Declaration, #5 Exhibit D-Risnoveanu Declaration, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E - Risnoveanu Declaration, #7 Declaration Burton Declaration, #8 Exhibit F-Burton Declaration, #9 Exhibit G-Burton Declaration, #10 Exhibit H-Burton Declaration, #11 Exhibit I-Burton Declaration, #12 Declaration Irish Declaration, #13 Exhibit K-Irish Declaration)(Burton, Daphne) (Filed on 2/3/2022) Modified on 2/4/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2022 Filing 24 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #15 First MOTION to Dismiss Pursant To Fed. Rule Civ. P. 12(B)(3) ) filed by IT Casino Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Julian Risnoveanu Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Risnoveanu Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Risnoveanu Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C- Risnoveanu Declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D - Risnoveanu Declaration, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E - Risnoveanu Declaration, #7 Declaration Daphne Burton Declaration, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F - Burton Declaration, #9 Exhibit Exhibit G - Burton Declaration, #10 Exhibit Exhibit H - Burton Declaration, #11 Exhibit Exhibit I - Burton Declaration, #12 Exhibit Exhibit J - Burton Declaration, #13 Declaration Tim Irish Declaration, #14 Exhibit Exhibit K - Irish Declaration)(Burton, Daphne) (Filed on 2/3/2022) Modified on 2/4/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Daniel S. Bretzius. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2022)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Case Management Conference reset for 4/12/2022 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Case Management Statement due by 4/5/2022. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 1/25/2022. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2022)
January 25, 2022 Filing 21 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Motion Hearing reset for 3/16/2022 02:00 PM before Judge William H. Orrick. This proceeding will be held via Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are remind ed that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/., Set/Reset Deadlines as to #15 First MOTION to Dismiss Pursant To Fed. Rule Civ. P. 12(B)(3). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2022)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 1/24/22. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2022)
January 21, 2022 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2022)
January 21, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16825606.) filed by Transient Path, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Bretzius, Daniel) (Filed on 1/21/2022)
January 20, 2022 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Entities by Transient Path, LLC (Eddy, Michael) (Filed on 1/20/2022)
January 20, 2022 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Transient Path, LLC.. (Eddy, Michael) (Filed on 1/20/2022)
January 20, 2022 Filing 15 First MOTION to Dismiss Pursant To Fed. Rule Civ. P. 12(B)(3) filed by Transient Path, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 3/10/2022 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 2/3/2022. Replies due by 2/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER)(Eddy, Michael) (Filed on 1/20/2022)
January 19, 2022 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by IT Casino Solutions, LLC., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by IT Casino Solutions, LLC (Burton, Daphne) (Filed on 1/19/2022)
January 13, 2022 Filing 13 Summons Reissued as to Thomas M Calvin. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2022)
January 13, 2022 Filing 12 Proposed Summons. (Burton, Daphne) (Filed on 1/13/2022)
January 12, 2022 #Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. The attached document is blank. Please re-file in its entirety with the service information. Re:[1 1] Summons Returned Executed filed by IT Casino Solutions, LLC (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2022)
January 12, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by IT Casino Solutions, LLC. Thomas M Calvin served on 1/12/2022, answer due 2/2/2022. (Burton, Daphne) (Filed on 1/12/2022)
January 12, 2022 Filing 10 Summons Returned Unexecuted by IT Casino Solutions, LLC as to Thomas M Calvin. (Burton, Daphne) (Filed on 1/12/2022)
January 12, 2022 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action; Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet; Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark; Plaintiff It Casino Solutions, INC.'s Certificate Of Interested Parties; Standing Order For United States Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler served on THOMAS M. CALVIN on 12/23/2021, filed by IT Casino Solutions, LLC. (Burton, Daphne) (Filed on 1/12/2022)
January 4, 2022 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by IT Casino Solutions, LLC.. (Burton, Daphne) (Filed on 1/4/2022)
December 23, 2021 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/17/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/24/2022 11:00 PM. (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2021)
December 23, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Thomas M Calvin, Transient Path, LLC. (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2021)
December 21, 2021 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/4/2022. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2021)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by IT CASINO SOLUTIONS, LLC, a California limited liability company identifying Other Affiliate IT Casino Solutions, Inc. for IT CASINO SOLUTIONS, LLC, a California limited liability company. re #1 Complaint, (Burton, Daphne) (Filed on 12/21/2021)
December 21, 2021 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a Patent or Trademark (cc: form mailed to register). (Burton, Daphne) (Filed on 12/21/2021)
December 21, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Burton, Daphne) (Filed on 12/21/2021)
December 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Thomas M Calvin, TRANSIENT PATH, LLC, a limited liability company ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16741343.) filed by IT CASINO SOLUTIONS, LLC, a California limited liability company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burton, Daphne) (Filed on 12/21/2021) Modified on 12/23/2021 (bns, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IT Casino Solutions, LLC v. TRANSIENT PATH, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IT CASINO SOLUTIONS, LLC, a California limited liability company
Represented By: Daphne Lisette Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IT Casino Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Daphne Lisette Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANSIENT PATH, LLC, a limited liability company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas M Calvin
Represented By: Michael Picco Eddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transient Path, LLC
Represented By: Daniel S Bretzius
Represented By: Michael Picco Eddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?