Casey's Distributing, Inc. v. National Football League, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: CASEY'S DISTRIBUTING, INC.
Defendant: NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, INC., NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE PROPERTIES, LLC, NFL ENTERPRISES LLC, Arizona Cardinals Football Club LLC, Atlanta Falcons Football Club, LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Team LLC, BUFFALO BILLS LLC, CAROLINA PANTHERS, LLC, The Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., Chargers Football Company, LLC, Cincinnati Bengals, Inc., CLEVELAND BROWNS FOOTBALL COMPANY, LLC, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Detroit Lions, Inc., Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., HOUSTON NFL HOLDINGS, L.P., Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars LLC, Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc.,, LAS VEGAS RAIDERS FOOTBALL LLC, MIAMI DOLPHINS LTD., Minnesota Vikings Football LLC, New England Patriots LLC, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, NEW YORK FOOTBALL GIANTS INC., New York Jets Football Club, Inc., PDB SPORTS, LTD. d/b/a DENVER BRONCOS FOOTBALL CLUB, THE PHILADELPHIA EAGLES FOOTBALL CLUB INC., Pittsburgh Steelers Sports Inc.,, THE RAMS FOOTBALL COMPANY LLC, SAN FRANCISCO FORTY NINERS II, LLC, Tennessee Football, Inc., Washington Football, Inc. and Fanatics, Inc.
Petitioner: Consumer Plaintiffs
Case Number: 3:2021cv09905
Filed: December 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2022 Filing 12 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by Consumer Plaintiffs. Responses due by 2/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Spencer Cox, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint in Hastings v. National Football League, Inc. et al., No. 3:21cv9908, #3 Exhibit B - Complaint in Hibbs v. National Football League, Inc. et al., No. 3:22cv00586, #4 Exhibit C - Complaint in Santos v. National Football League, Inc. et al., No. 3:22cv00855, #5 Proposed Order)(Cox, Spencer) (Filed on 2/18/2022)
January 19, 2022 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Casey's Distributing, Inc. Plaintiff's Disclosure Statement and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Under FRCP 7.1 and Civil L.R. 3-15 (Bright, Thomas) (Filed on 1/19/2022)
January 19, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin S. Nematzadeh (Nematzadeh, Justin) (Filed on 1/19/2022)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order. Signed 1/19/2022 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Justin Nematzadeh for plaintiff.(klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2022)
January 14, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16808310.) filed by Casey's Distributing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Nematzadeh, Justin) (Filed on 1/14/2022)
January 4, 2022 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Casey's Distributing, Inc... (Bright, Thomas) (Filed on 1/4/2022)
December 22, 2021 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/18/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/25/2022 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor.Correction of docket 5. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2021)
December 22, 2021 Filing 5 FILED IN ERROR. See #6 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2021) Modified on 12/23/2021 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
December 22, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Arizona Cardinals Football Club LLC, Atlanta Falcons Football Club, LLC, BUFFALO BILLS LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Team LLC, CAROLINA PANTHERS, LLC, CLEVELAND BROWNS FOOTBALL COMPANY, LLC, Chargers Football Company, LLC, Cincinnati Bengals, Inc., Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Detroit Lions, Inc., Fanatics, Inc., Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., HOUSTON NFL HOLDINGS, L.P., Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars LLC, Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc.,, LAS VEGAS RAIDERS FOOTBALL LLC, MIAMI DOLPHINS LTD., Minnesota Vikings Football LLC, NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE PROPERTIES, LLC, NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, INC., NEW YORK FOOTBALL GIANTS INC., NFL ENTERPRISES LLC, New England Patriots LLC, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, New York Jets Football Club, Inc., PDB SPORTS, LTD. d/b/a DENVER BRONCOS FOOTBALL CLUB, Pittsburgh Steelers Sports Inc.,, SAN FRANCISCO FORTY NINERS II, LLC, THE PHILADELPHIA EAGLES FOOTBALL CLUB INC., THE RAMS FOOTBALL COMPANY LLC, Tennessee Football, Inc., The Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., Washington Football, Inc.. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2021)
December 22, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/5/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2021)
December 21, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Bright, Thomas) (Filed on 12/21/2021)
December 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief for Violations of Federal and California Antitrust and California Unfair Competition Laws against Arizona Cardinals Football Club LLC, Atlanta Falcons Football Club, LLC, BUFFALO BILLS LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Team LLC, CAROLINA PANTHERS, LLC, CLEVELAND BROWNS FOOTBALL COMPANY, LLC, Chargers Football Company, LLC, Cincinnati Bengals, Inc., Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Detroit Lions, Inc., Fanatics, Inc., Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., HOUSTON NFL HOLDINGS, L.P., Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars LLC, Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc.,, LAS VEGAS RAIDERS FOOTBALL LLC, MIAMI DOLPHINS LTD., Minnesota Vikings Football LLC, NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE PROPERTIES, LLC, NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, INC., NEW YORK FOOTBALL GIANTS INC., NFL ENTERPRISES LLC, New England Patriots LLC, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, New York Jets Football Club, Inc., PDB SPORTS, LTD. d/b/a DENVER BRONCOS FOOTBALL CLUB, Pittsburgh Steelers Sports Inc.,, SAN FRANCISCO FORTY NINERS II, LLC, THE PHILADELPHIA EAGLES FOOTBALL CLUB INC., THE RAMS FOOTBALL COMPANY LLC, Tennessee Football, Inc., The Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., Washington Football, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16743260.). Filed byCASEY'S DISTRIBUTING, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bright, Thomas) (Filed on 12/21/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casey's Distributing, Inc. v. National Football League, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CASEY'S DISTRIBUTING, INC.
Represented By: Thomas C. Bright
Represented By: Justin S. Nematzadeh
Represented By: Solomon B. Cera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE PROPERTIES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFL ENTERPRISES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Cardinals Football Club LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlanta Falcons Football Club, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buccaneers Team LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUFFALO BILLS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAROLINA PANTHERS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chargers Football Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cincinnati Bengals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEVELAND BROWNS FOOTBALL COMPANY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detroit Lions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Football Northwest LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Bay Packers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOUSTON NFL HOLDINGS, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indianapolis Colts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacksonville Jaguars LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAS VEGAS RAIDERS FOOTBALL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIAMI DOLPHINS LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Vikings Football LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New England Patriots LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW YORK FOOTBALL GIANTS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Jets Football Club, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PDB SPORTS, LTD. d/b/a DENVER BRONCOS FOOTBALL CLUB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PHILADELPHIA EAGLES FOOTBALL CLUB INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pittsburgh Steelers Sports Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE RAMS FOOTBALL COMPANY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAN FRANCISCO FORTY NINERS II, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee Football, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Football, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fanatics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Consumer Plaintiffs
Represented By: Spencer Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?