Fiscal Court of Adair County et al v. McKinsey and Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Fiscal Court of Adair County, Fiscal Court of Allen County, Fiscal Court ofBullitt County, Fiscal Court of Carlisle County, Fiscal Court of Christian County, Louisville/Jefferson County Metro Government, Fiscal Court of Cumberland County, Fiscal Court of Henderson County, Fiscal Court of Hopkins County, Fiscal Court of Marshall County, Fiscal Court of Oldham County and Fiscal Court of Union County
Defendant: McKinsey and Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv09923
Filed: December 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2021 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of Kentucky Western; Case Number 1:21-cv-00156. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 28, 2021 MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 2996: Western District of Kentucky, 1:21-cv-00156, Fiscal Court of Adair County et al v. McKinsey and Company, Inc., Opened in California Northern District as 3:21-cv-09923-CRB pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 19 cc: JPMDL (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2021)
December 21, 2021 Filing 14 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. CTO-19 from ND/CA re MDL 2996. (KJA)
December 16, 2021 Filing 13 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency L.J. Hollenbach, III re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: attorney not an ECF Registered filer. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 1/4/2022. (KJA)
December 6, 2021 Filing 12 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Russell W. Budd re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 12/20/2021. (KJA)
December 6, 2021 Filing 11 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Peter J. Mougey re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 12/20/2021. (KJA)
December 6, 2021 Filing 10 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Mark P. Pifko re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 12/20/2021. (KJA)
December 6, 2021 Filing 9 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to James C. Peterson re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 12/20/2021. (KJA)
December 6, 2021 Filing 8 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to James L. Magazine re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 12/20/2021. (KJA)
December 6, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to J. Burton LeBlanc re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 12/20/2021. (KJA)
December 6, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Christine Cooney Mansour re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 12/23/2021. (KJA)
December 6, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Charles G. Orr re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 12/23/2021. (KJA)
December 6, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Anthony J. Majestro re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 12/23/2021. (KJA)
November 23, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE ON SUMMONS re #1 Complaint. (CDF)
November 23, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (CDF)
November 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against McKinsey and Company, Inc., filed by The Fiscal Court of Adair County, The Fiscal Court of Allen County, The Fiscal Court of Bullitt County, The Fiscal Court of Carlisle County, The Fiscal Court of Christian County, Louisville/Jefferson County Metro Government, The Fiscal Court of Cumberland County, The Fiscal Court of Henderson County, The Fiscal Court of Hopkins County, The Fiscal Court of Marshall County, The Fiscal Court of Oldham County, The Fiscal Court of Union County. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AKYWDC-3476846.) (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (CDF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fiscal Court of Adair County et al v. McKinsey and Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fiscal Court of Adair County
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Represented By: Charles G. Orr
Represented By: Christine Cooney Mansour
Represented By: Elmer J. George
Represented By: Gillard B. Johnson, III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: James C. Peterson
Represented By: L. J. Hollenbach, III
Represented By: Mark K. Gray
Represented By: Mark P Pifko
Represented By: Michael J. Fuller, Jr.
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Peter J. Mougey
Represented By: Russell W. Budd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fiscal Court of Allen County
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Represented By: Charles G. Orr
Represented By: Christine Cooney Mansour
Represented By: Elmer J. George
Represented By: Gillard B. Johnson, III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: James C. Peterson
Represented By: L. J. Hollenbach, III
Represented By: Mark K. Gray
Represented By: Mark P Pifko
Represented By: Michael J. Fuller, Jr.
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Peter J. Mougey
Represented By: Russell W. Budd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fiscal Court ofBullitt County
Represented By: Peter J. Mougey
Represented By: Russell W. Budd
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Represented By: Charles G. Orr
Represented By: Christine Cooney Mansour
Represented By: Elmer J. George
Represented By: Gillard B. Johnson, III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: James C. Peterson
Represented By: L. J. Hollenbach, III
Represented By: Mark K. Gray
Represented By: Mark P Pifko
Represented By: Michael J. Fuller, Jr.
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fiscal Court of Carlisle County
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Represented By: Charles G. Orr
Represented By: Christine Cooney Mansour
Represented By: Elmer J. George
Represented By: Gillard B. Johnson, III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: James C. Peterson
Represented By: L. J. Hollenbach, III
Represented By: Mark K. Gray
Represented By: Mark P Pifko
Represented By: Michael J. Fuller, Jr.
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Peter J. Mougey
Represented By: Russell W. Budd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fiscal Court of Christian County
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Represented By: Charles G. Orr
Represented By: Christine Cooney Mansour
Represented By: Elmer J. George
Represented By: Gillard B. Johnson, III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: James C. Peterson
Represented By: L. J. Hollenbach, III
Represented By: Mark K. Gray
Represented By: Mark P Pifko
Represented By: Michael J. Fuller, Jr.
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Peter J. Mougey
Represented By: Russell W. Budd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisville/Jefferson County Metro Government
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Represented By: Charles G. Orr
Represented By: Christine Cooney Mansour
Represented By: Elmer J. George
Represented By: Gillard B. Johnson, III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: James C. Peterson
Represented By: L. J. Hollenbach, III
Represented By: Mark K. Gray
Represented By: Mark P Pifko
Represented By: Michael J. Fuller, Jr.
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Peter J. Mougey
Represented By: Russell W. Budd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fiscal Court of Cumberland County
Represented By: Gillard B. Johnson, III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Represented By: Charles G. Orr
Represented By: Christine Cooney Mansour
Represented By: Elmer J. George
Represented By: James C. Peterson
Represented By: L. J. Hollenbach, III
Represented By: Mark K. Gray
Represented By: Mark P Pifko
Represented By: Michael J. Fuller, Jr.
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Peter J. Mougey
Represented By: Russell W. Budd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fiscal Court of Henderson County
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Represented By: Charles G. Orr
Represented By: Christine Cooney Mansour
Represented By: Elmer J. George
Represented By: Gillard B. Johnson, III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: James C. Peterson
Represented By: L. J. Hollenbach, III
Represented By: Mark K. Gray
Represented By: Mark P Pifko
Represented By: Michael J. Fuller, Jr.
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Peter J. Mougey
Represented By: Russell W. Budd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fiscal Court of Hopkins County
Represented By: L. J. Hollenbach, III
Represented By: Mark K. Gray
Represented By: Mark P Pifko
Represented By: Michael J. Fuller, Jr.
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Peter J. Mougey
Represented By: Russell W. Budd
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Represented By: Charles G. Orr
Represented By: Christine Cooney Mansour
Represented By: Elmer J. George
Represented By: Gillard B. Johnson, III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: James C. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fiscal Court of Marshall County
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Represented By: Charles G. Orr
Represented By: Christine Cooney Mansour
Represented By: Elmer J. George
Represented By: Gillard B. Johnson, III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: James C. Peterson
Represented By: L. J. Hollenbach, III
Represented By: Mark K. Gray
Represented By: Mark P Pifko
Represented By: Michael J. Fuller, Jr.
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Peter J. Mougey
Represented By: Russell W. Budd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fiscal Court of Oldham County
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Represented By: Charles G. Orr
Represented By: Christine Cooney Mansour
Represented By: Elmer J. George
Represented By: Gillard B. Johnson, III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: James C. Peterson
Represented By: L. J. Hollenbach, III
Represented By: Mark K. Gray
Represented By: Mark P Pifko
Represented By: Michael J. Fuller, Jr.
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Peter J. Mougey
Represented By: Russell W. Budd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fiscal Court of Union County
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Represented By: Charles G. Orr
Represented By: Christine Cooney Mansour
Represented By: Peter J. Mougey
Represented By: Russell W. Budd
Represented By: Elmer J. George
Represented By: Gillard B. Johnson, III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: James C. Peterson
Represented By: L. J. Hollenbach, III
Represented By: Mark K. Gray
Represented By: Mark P Pifko
Represented By: Michael J. Fuller, Jr.
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey and Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?