Wolf v. Mason-McDuffie Real Estate, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Robert J Wolf and Robert J. Wolf
Defendant: Mason-McDuffie Real Estate, Inc., Edmond L. Krafchow and Kathy Krafchow
Case Number: 3:2022cv00627
Filed: January 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Maxine M Chesney
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Proof of Service of Counterclaim served on Christopher F. Whol on March 22, 2022, filed by Edmond L. Krafchow, Kathy Krafchow, Mason-McDuffie Real Estate, Inc.. (Tagliarini, Thomas) (Filed on 3/22/2022) Modified on 3/23/2022 (gba, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Proof of Service of Answer served on Christopher F. Whol on March 22, 2022, filed by Edmond L. Krafchow, Kathy Krafchow, Mason-McDuffie Real Estate, Inc.. (Tagliarini, Thomas) (Filed on 3/22/2022) Modified on 3/23/2022 (gba, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 COUNTERCLAIM against Robert J. Wolf. Filed by Kathy Krafchow, Edmond L. Krafchow, Mason-McDuffie Real Estate, Inc.. (Tagliarini, Thomas) (Filed on 3/22/2022)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byEdmond L. Krafchow, Kathy Krafchow, Mason-McDuffie Real Estate, Inc.. (Tagliarini, Thomas) (Filed on 3/22/2022)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robert J Wolf re #11 Case Management Scheduling Order, (Wohl, Christopher) (Filed on 3/17/2022)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ON STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. The deadline for defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to March 22, 2022. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 10, 2022. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2022)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER For Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Kathy Krafchow. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stipulation, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Tagliarini, Thomas) (Filed on 3/9/2022)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/3/2022 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/27/2022.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 2/18/2022. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2022)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robert J Wolf re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Wohl, Christopher) (Filed on 2/15/2022)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by the Clerk on 2/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2022)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2022)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Robert J Wolf.. (Wohl, Christopher) (Filed on 2/14/2022)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Edmond L. Krafchow, Kathy Krafchow, Mason-McDuffie Real Estate, Inc.. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2022)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/27/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/4/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2022)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Wohl, Christopher) (Filed on 1/31/2022)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/14/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2022)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Robert J Wolf . (Wohl, Christopher) (Filed on 1/31/2022)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16854856.). Filed byRobert J Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wohl, Christopher) (Filed on 1/31/2022)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. Incorrect PDF attached. [err201]Please resubmit current Civil Cover Sheet JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 10/2020) from our website www.cand.uscourts.gov. No judg e assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet.This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: #1 Complaint filed by Robert J Wolf (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolf v. Mason-McDuffie Real Estate, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J Wolf
Represented By: Christopher Frederick Wohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J. Wolf
Represented By: Christopher Frederick Wohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mason-McDuffie Real Estate, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Charles Tagliarini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmond L. Krafchow
Represented By: Thomas Charles Tagliarini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Krafchow
Represented By: Thomas Charles Tagliarini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?