Gomez v. Mont St. John Cellars, Inc.
Plaintiff: Andres Gomez
Defendant: Mont St. John Cellars, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00635
Filed: January 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2022 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by Mont St. John Cellars, Inc. (Morin, Richard) (Filed on 2/18/2022)
February 18, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMont St. John Cellars, Inc.. (Morin, Richard) (Filed on 2/18/2022)
February 18, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J. Morin (Morin, Richard) (Filed on 2/18/2022)
February 4, 2022 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE UPON REASSIGNMNET: Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/29/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/5/2022 at 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor. (ec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2022) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on February 4, 2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2022)
February 3, 2022 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2022)
February 1, 2022 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andres Gomez.. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 2/1/2022)
February 1, 2022 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2022)
February 1, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Mont St. John Cellars, Inc.. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2022)
February 1, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaina Duggal (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Duggal, Aaina) (Filed on 2/1/2022)
February 1, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Cara Patricia Townsend (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Townsend, Cara) (Filed on 2/1/2022)
January 31, 2022 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/14/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2022)
January 31, 2022 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 1/31/2022)
January 31, 2022 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Andres Gomez re #1 Complaint (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 1/31/2022)
January 31, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16856393.). Filed byAndres Gomez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 1/31/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomez v. Mont St. John Cellars, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andres Gomez
Represented By: Amanda Lockhart Seabock
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr.
Represented By: Russell Clive Handy
Represented By: Zachary Best
Represented By: Aaina Duggal
Represented By: Cara Patricia Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mont St. John Cellars, Inc.
Represented By: Richard J. Morin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?