CardStarter, Ltd. v. SundaeSwap, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: CardStarter, Ltd.
Defendant: SundaeSwap, Inc., Mateen Motavaf, Pi Lanningham, Artem Wright and Christopher Borders
Case Number: 3:2022cv00757
Filed: February 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Referring Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2022 Filing 27 Request for Judicial Notice re #26 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed byChristopher Borders, Pi Lanningham, Mateen Motavaf, SundaeSwap, Inc., Artem Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Collaboration and Marketing Agreement)(Related document(s) #26 ) (Martin, Eric) (Filed on 3/31/2022)
March 31, 2022 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Christopher Borders, Pi Lanningham, Mateen Motavaf, SundaeSwap, Inc., Artem Wright. Motion Hearing set for 6/17/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 4/29/2022. Replies due by 5/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint)(Martin, Eric) (Filed on 3/31/2022)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE OF PARTIES by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #23 Stipulation. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2022)
March 2, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Simren Kaur Gill (Gill, Simren) (Filed on 3/2/2022)
March 2, 2022 Filing 23 JOINT STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint and Briefing Schedule of Parties filed by SundaeSwap, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Martin)(Martin, Eric) (Filed on 3/2/2022) Modified on 3/8/2022 (gba, COURT STAFF).
March 2, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric David Martin (Martin, Eric) (Filed on 3/2/2022)
February 17, 2022 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/10/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/17/2022 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2022)
February 17, 2022 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CardStarter, Ltd. / Proof of Service of Summons (Lakatos, Alex) (Filed on 2/17/2022)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 02/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2022)
February 16, 2022 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2022)
February 15, 2022 Filing 17 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by CardStarter, Ltd... (Lakatos, Alex) (Filed on 2/15/2022)
February 15, 2022 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CardStarter, Ltd. / Proof of Service of Summons (Lakatos, Alex) (Filed on 2/15/2022)
February 15, 2022 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CardStarter, Ltd. / Proof of Service of Summons (Lakatos, Alex) (Filed on 2/15/2022)
February 7, 2022 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Christopher Borders, Pi Lanningham, Mateen Motavaf, SundaeSwap, Inc., Artem Wright. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2022)
February 7, 2022 Filing 13 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/8/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/5/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2022)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2022)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2022)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2022)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2022)
February 4, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16875016.) filed by CardStarter, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Durham, Anna) (Filed on 2/4/2022)
February 4, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16874631.) filed by CardStarter, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Gray, Kathryne) (Filed on 2/4/2022)
February 4, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16874533.) filed by CardStarter, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Kim, Grace) (Filed on 2/4/2022)
February 4, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16874433.) filed by CardStarter, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Rosenfeld, Richard) (Filed on 2/4/2022)
February 4, 2022 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/18/2022. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2022)
February 4, 2022 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by CardStarter, Ltd. (Lakatos, Alex) (Filed on 2/4/2022)
February 4, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Lakatos, Alex) (Filed on 2/4/2022)
February 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Promissory Estoppel against Christopher Borders, Pi Lanningham, Mateen Motavaf, SundaeSwap, Inc., Artem Wright (Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number ACANDC-16874202.). Filed by CardStarter, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lakatos, Alex) (Filed on 2/4/2022) Modified on 2/7/2022 (gba, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CardStarter, Ltd. v. SundaeSwap, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CardStarter, Ltd.
Represented By: Anna Durham
Represented By: Grace Kim
Represented By: Kathryne Marie Gray
Represented By: Richard Rosenfeld
Represented By: Alex C. Lakatos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SundaeSwap, Inc.
Represented By: Eric David Martin
Represented By: Simren Kaur Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mateen Motavaf
Represented By: Eric David Martin
Represented By: Simren Kaur Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pi Lanningham
Represented By: Eric David Martin
Represented By: Simren Kaur Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Artem Wright
Represented By: Eric David Martin
Represented By: Simren Kaur Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Borders
Represented By: Eric David Martin
Represented By: Simren Kaur Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?