Kennedy v. City of Sausalito
Plaintiff: Kenneth Kennedy
Defendant: City of Sausalito
Case Number: 3:2022cv00902
Filed: February 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Referring Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. For the status conference in Case No. C-21-1143 EMC Sausalito/Marin County Chapter of the California Homeless Union v. City of Sausalito, to be held on 4/19/2022 at 2:30 p.m., the parties should be prepared to discuss how best to coordinate the related cases (currently numbering six) with the "main" case, No. C-21-1143 EMC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/4/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
March 2, 2022 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #11 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #9 Order Relating Case, #8 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases, #7 Order Reassigning Case, Case Assigned/Reassigned, #6 Order of Recusal, #5 Order Reassigning Case, Case Assigned/Reassigned, #4 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment, #3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 03/02/2022, a copy of the orders were served by first class mail to 1104 Elm Drive, Novato, CA 94945, to the non-CM/ECF user (Kenneth Kennedy) listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2022)
March 1, 2022 Filing 14 Mail sent to Kenneth Kennedy returned as undeliverable re #6 Order of Recusal, #4 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2022)
March 1, 2022 Filing 13 Mail sent to Kenneth Kennedy returned as undeliverable re #6 Order of Recusal, #4 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2022)
March 1, 2022 Filing 12 Mail sent to Kenneth Kennedy returned as undeliverable re #11 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2022)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting #2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Dismissing Case with Leave to Amend, and Denying Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order. Amended Complaint due by 3/17/2022. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
February 17, 2022 Filing 10 Case Reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen. Judge James Donato no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2022)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RELATING CASES: 21-cv-01143-EMC, 22-cv-00902-JD. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/16/2022. (bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
February 15, 2022 Filing 8 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re C-21-1143-EMC. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/15/2022. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Judge Susan Illston no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 2/15/22. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 2/14/22. (ec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 02/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
February 14, 2022 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)Copy placed in O:Drive for mailing on 2/14/2022 (klh, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2022 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/13/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/20/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
February 14, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kenneth Kennedy. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2022)
February 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Motion for Temporary Restraining Order against City of Sausalito. Filed by Kenneth Kennedy. Consent/Declination due by 2/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kennedy v. City of Sausalito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Sausalito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?