Gaskins v. Antero Resources Corporation
Plaintiff: Joseph Benton Gaskins
Defendant: Antero Resources Corporation
Case Number: 3:2022cv00971
Filed: February 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Referring Judge: PSLC JNE
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2022 Case transferred from Northern District of California has been opened in District of Colorado as case 1:22-cv-00459, filed 02/23/2022. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2022)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 2/22/2022. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
February 17, 2022 Filing 4 Letter from Joseph Gaskins. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2022)
February 17, 2022 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 3/28/2022. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
February 17, 2022 Filing 2 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Joseph Benton Gaskins. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2022)
February 17, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Antero Resources Corporation. Filed by Joseph Benton Gaskins. Consent/Declination due by 3/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaskins v. Antero Resources Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Benton Gaskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antero Resources Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?