Williams v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Williams
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA, Wells Fargo & Co., and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00990
Filed: February 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Housing Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Benjamin L. Crump. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2022)
April 14, 2022 Filing 23 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17086873.) filed by Christopher Williams. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing: Northern District of Fla, #2 Certificate of Good Standing: Fla., #3 Certificate of Good Standing: DC, #4 Certificate of Good Standing: Tenn.)(Crump, Benjamin) (Filed on 4/14/2022)
April 14, 2022 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Filed by Christopher Williams. (Friedman, Linda) (Filed on 4/14/2022) Modified on 4/15/2022 (slh, COURT STAFF).
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Suzanne E Bish. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2022)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to George Robot. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2022)
March 23, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number ACANDC-17018852) filed by Christopher Williams. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Bish, Suzanne) (Filed on 3/23/2022)
March 23, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number ACANDC-17018814) filed by Christopher Williams. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Robot, George) (Filed on 3/23/2022)
March 21, 2022 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Christopher Williams. Service waived by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. waiver sent on 3/4/2022, answer due 5/3/2022. (Calvert, Jared) (Filed on 3/21/2022)
March 21, 2022 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Christopher Williams. Service waived by Wells Fargo & Co., waiver sent on 3/4/2022, answer due 5/3/2022. (Calvert, Jared) (Filed on 3/21/2022)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/19/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 5/12/2022. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/7/2022. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2022)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 3/4/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2022)
March 3, 2022 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2022)
March 3, 2022 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Christopher Williams.. (Lewin, Daniel) (Filed on 3/3/2022)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #8 Jared A. Calvert's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2022)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #7 Daniel B. Lewin's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2022)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #6 Linda D. Friedman's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2022)
February 23, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number ACANDC-16928041) filed by Christopher Williams. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Calvert, Jared) (Filed on 2/23/2022)
February 23, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number ACANDC-16927752) filed by Christopher Williams. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Lewin, Daniel) (Filed on 2/23/2022)
February 22, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number ACANDC-16925235) filed by Christopher Williams. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Friedman, Linda) (Filed on 2/22/2022)
February 18, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Defendants Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2022)
February 18, 2022 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/11/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/18/2022 at 1:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2022)
February 18, 2022 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/4/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2022)
February 17, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Sani, Sam) (Filed on 2/17/2022)
February 17, 2022 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; Jury Trial Demanded against Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., (Filing Fee: $402.00, receipt number BCANDC-16916622). Filed by Christopher Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sani, Sam) (Filed on 2/17/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Williams
Represented By: Sam Sani
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Represented By: Daniel Lewin
Represented By: George S. Robot
Represented By: Jared Calvert
Represented By: Linda D Friedman
Represented By: Linda D. Friedman
Represented By: Suzanne Elaine Bish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Co.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?