Hall-Infantino v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Theresa Hall-Infantio and Theresa Hall-Infantino
Defendant: FCA US LLC and DOES 1 through 10 inclusive
Case Number: 3:2022cv00994
Filed: February 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Referring Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2022 Filing 33 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/1/2022. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2022)
November 30, 2022 Filing 32 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING PLAINTIFF(S/S) COSTS AND EXPENSES and REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 68(a) filed by Theresa Hall-Infantino. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT)(Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 11/30/2022)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case management conference set for July 29, 2022 is vacated. A Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/2/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/9/2022 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/25/2022. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2022)
July 25, 2022 CASE REFERRED to Private Mediation. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2022)
July 22, 2022 Filing 30 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Rule 26(f) filed by Theresa Hall-Infantino. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 7/22/2022)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #24 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Scott S. Shepardson terminated. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2022)
July 15, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Ali Azemoon (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Azemoon, Ali) (Filed on 7/15/2022)
July 15, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Greg Gruzman (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gruzman, Greg) (Filed on 7/15/2022)
July 15, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Hailey Marie Rogerson (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rogerson, Hailey) (Filed on 7/15/2022)
July 15, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Peter Hugret (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer) (Filed on 7/15/2022)
July 15, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION for Substitution of Counsel by Scott S. Shepardson (Shepardson, Scott) (Filed on 7/15/2022) Modified on 7/15/2022 (sfb, COURT STAFF).
July 15, 2022 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #24 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by FCA US LLC (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2022)
June 22, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE by Theresa Hall-Infantino of Disassociation of Counsel for Plaintiff (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 6/22/2022)
May 17, 2022 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/22/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/29/2022 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2022)
May 17, 2022 Filing 21 Case reassigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 5/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2022)
May 17, 2022 Filing 20 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2022)
May 17, 2022 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned.This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2022)
May 16, 2022 Filing 18 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Theresa Hall-Infantino.. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 5/16/2022)
May 16, 2022 Filing 17 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by FCA US LLC.. (Shepardson, Scott) (Filed on 5/16/2022)
May 9, 2022 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE RE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: In view of the Court's trial calendar, the Initial Case Management Conference is re-set for 6/14/2022 01:30 PM. The joint case management statement is due by 6/7/2022. All other deadlines set in #4 Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines are adjusted accordingly. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2022)
May 4, 2022 Filing 15 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Shepardson, Scott) (Filed on 5/4/2022)
May 3, 2022 Filing 14 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 5/3/2022)
May 2, 2022 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 5/16/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2022)
April 26, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Ariel S. Harman-Holmes (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 4/26/2022)
March 30, 2022 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by FCA US LLC identifying Corporate Parent FCA North America Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent FCA US LLC, Corporate Parent FCA Holdco B.V., Corporate Parent Stellantis N.V. (formerly known as Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V.) for FCA US LLC. (Shepardson, Scott) (Filed on 3/30/2022)
March 30, 2022 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by FCA US LLC (Shepardson, Scott) (Filed on 3/30/2022)
March 30, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint byFCA US LLC. (Shepardson, Scott) (Filed on 3/30/2022)
March 30, 2022 #Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate pare nts.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #10 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by FCA US LLC (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2022)
March 15, 2022 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety as Summons Returned Executed. Re: #8 Certificate of Service filed by Theresa Hall-In fantino (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2022)
March 14, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Theresa Hall-Infantino re #4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #5 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, #6 Civil Cover Sheet (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 3/14/2022)
March 10, 2022 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by Theresa Hall-Infantino (Kuemerle, Karin) (Filed on 3/10/2022)
March 10, 2022 Filing 6 Civil Cover Sheet by Theresa Hall-Infantino . (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 3/10/2022)
February 18, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to FCA US LLC. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2022)
February 18, 2022 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/17/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/24/2022 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2022)
February 18, 2022 Case has been randomly assigned to judge, however incorrect Civil Cover Sheet CAND 44 (Rev. 04/21) used at case opening. Please complete and re-file as a separate docket entry correct Civil Cover Sheet JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 10/20 re:[1. #2 Complaint filed by Terrence Shanahan (bwS). (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2022)
February 17, 2022 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/3/2022. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2022)
February 17, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 2/17/2022)
February 17, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violation of Statutory Obligations against DOES 1 through 10 inclusive, FCA US LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16917255.). Filed byTheresa Hall-Infantio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2017 Chrysler Pacifica Express Warranty, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 2/17/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall-Infantino v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Hall-Infantio
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Hall-Infantino
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Ariel S. Harman-Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Scott S. Shepardson
Represented By: Ali Azemoon
Represented By: Greg Gruzman
Represented By: Hailey Marie Rogerson
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?