Hurtado v. Double AA Corporation
Defendant: Double AA Corporation and Robbie Hurtado
Case Number: 3:2022cv01090
Filed: February 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2022 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Statement due by 11/3/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/10/2022 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Parties are to refer to Judge Alsup's standing orders on the following webpage for further instructions: https://cand.uscourts.gov/judges/alsup-william-wha/ (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2022)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #9 Stipulation to Continue General Order 56 Deadlines. (afm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2022)
April 5, 2022 Filing 9 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE GENERAL ORDER 56 DEADLINES filed by Double AA Corporation. (Andreoli, Dana) (Filed on 4/5/2022)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 03/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2022)
March 21, 2022 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2022)
March 21, 2022 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Double AA Corporation.. (Andreoli, Dana) (Filed on 3/21/2022)
March 11, 2022 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff/Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 3/25/2022. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 3/25/2022. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2022)
March 1, 2022 Filing 4 Double AA Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byDouble AA Corporation. (Quan, Stacey) (Filed on 3/1/2022)
February 23, 2022 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2022)
February 22, 2022 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/8/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2022)
February 22, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California, County of Contra Costa. Their case number is MSC22-00003, (Filing Fee: $402.00, receipt number ACANDC-16925856). Filed by Double AA Corporation. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #(2) Civil Cover Sheet)(Quan, Stacey) (Filed on 2/22/2022) Modified on 2/23/2022 (tn, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hurtado v. Double AA Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Double AA Corporation
Represented By: Stacey Chau Quan
Represented By: Dana Marie Andreoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robbie Hurtado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?