J.J. et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: J. J. and P. R. J.
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Noramco, McKinsey & Company Inc. United States and West Virginia Board of Pharmacy
Case Number: 3:2022cv01443
Filed: March 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2022 Filing 33 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:21-cv-00461. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 7, 2022 MEMBER CASE OPENED: re 3:21-md-02996-CRB; Southern District of West Virginia, 2:21-cv-00461 J.J. v. Johnson & Johnson, opened in California Northern District as 3:22-cv-01443-CRB pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order Transfer Order cc: JPMDL (wsn-adi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2022)
March 3, 2022 Filing 32 TRANSFER ORDER, JUDICIAL PANEL ON MDL: certified copy from the Northern District of California transferring this action to the USDC/CAND for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Signed by Karen K. Caldwell, Chair of the Panel on 3/3/2022. (cc: attys) (kew)
December 13, 2021 Filing 31 TRANSFER ORDER FROM JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION re: MDL 2804 and MDL 2996. (kew)
December 10, 2021 Filing 30 TRANSFER ORDER FROM JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION re: MDL 2804 and MDL 2996. (kew)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #7 Joint Motion for an Immediate Stay of All Further Proceedings Pending Transfer; directing that all further proceedings and deadlines are STAYED; the Clerk is DIRECTED to remove this case from the Court's active docket; if the case is not transferred on 10/2/2021, the parties are DIRECTED to inform the Court within 15 days. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 10/21/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew)
October 19, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE OF HEARING SESSION set for 12/2/2021 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Original filed before the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (kew)
October 15, 2021 Filing 27 REPLY by J. J., P. R. J. to #26 Joint Response In Opposition. (Adams, Benjamin)
October 8, 2021 Filing 26 JOINT RESPONSE by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States, Noramco in opposition to #18 MOTION by J. J., P. R. J. to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Kanawha County. (Williams, Marc)
October 5, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #25 Order granting #24 MOTION by Noramco for Extension of Time to File Response; time to respond to the motion to remand is due no later than 10/8/2021. ERROR: Image contained extra blank page. CORRECTION: Image replaced. (mk)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 MOTION by Noramco for Extension of Time to File Response; time to respond to the motion to remand is due no later than 10/8/2021. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 10/4/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (mfo) (Modified on 10/5/2021 to replace image; removed extra blank page) (mk).
September 30, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION by Noramco to Extend Time for Response to #18 MOTION by J. J., P. R. J. to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Kanawha County. (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Mowen, Kelly)
September 30, 2021 Filing 23 JOINDER by Noramco in #20 JOINT MOTION by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States to Extend Deadlines Related to #18 Motion to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Kanawha County. (Mowen, Kelly) (Modified on 10/1/2021 to add link to #20 motion and to convert event to notice(other)) (kew).
September 30, 2021 Filing 22 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Noramco (Mowen, Kelly)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER The Court GRANTS the Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and McKinsey & Company, Inc.'s ("Moving Defendants") #20 JOINT MOTION to Extend Deadlines Related to Motion to Remand, and EXTENDS the deadline for Moving Defendants to respond to Plaintiffs' #18 MOTION to Remand until 10/8/2021. Any reply must be filed within 7 days from the date of service of the memorandum in response to the motion. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 9/30/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (arb)
September 28, 2021 Filing 20 JOINT MOTION by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States to Extend Deadlines Related to #18 Motion to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Kanawha County. (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Marc)
September 17, 2021 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM by J. J., P. R. J. in support of #18 MOTION by J. J., P. R. J. to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Kanawha County. (Adams, Benjamin)
September 17, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION by J. J., P. R. J. to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Kanawha County (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Adams, Benjamin)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting defendants' #11 joint motion for clarification of the order and notice and extending the dates and deadlines in the Order and Notice as follows: Motions under FR Civ P 12(b) - 11/15/2021. Last day for Rule 26(f) meeting - 11/29/2021. Last day to file Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - 12/6/2021. Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 2:00 PM on 12/10/2021, before the undersigned, unless canceled. Entry of Scheduling Order - 12/15/2021. Last day to serve FR Civ P 26(a)(1) disclosures - 12/23/2021 and further directing defendants' #14 Emergency Motion to Extend Deadline is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 9/14/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (mfo)
September 13, 2021 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by West Virginia Board of Pharmacy in support of #15 MOTION by West Virginia Board of Pharmacy to Dismiss Complaint. (Taylor, Justin)
September 13, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION by West Virginia Board of Pharmacy to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal. (Taylor, Justin) (Modified on 9/14/2021 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (kew).
September 13, 2021 Filing 14 EMERGENCY MOTION by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States, Noramco, West Virginia Board of Pharmacy to Extend Deadline to File Motion to Dismiss. (Williams, Marc)
September 10, 2021 Filing 13 REPLY by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States to #12 Response In Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(George, Keith)
September 3, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE by J. J., P. R. J. in opposition to #7 JOINT MOTION by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States for an Immediate Stay of All Further Proceedings Pending Transfer (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Adams, Benjamin)
September 3, 2021 Filing 11 JOINT MOTION by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States, Noramco, West Virginia Board of Pharmacy for Clarification of #10 Order and Notice. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(George, Keith)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER AND NOTICE: Motions under FR Civ P 12(b) - 9/13/2021. Last day for Rule 26(f) meeting - 9/27/2021. Last day to file Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - 10/4/2021. Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 2:00 PM on 10/8/2021, before the undersigned, unless canceled. Entry of Scheduling Order - 10/13/2021. Last day to serve FR Civ P 26(a)(1) disclosures - 10/22/2021. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 8/26/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew)
August 25, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME IN WHICH NORAMCO MAY RESPOND TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Noramco, P. R. J., J. J. (Mowen, Kelly) (Modified on 8/26/2021 to add party filers) (kew).
August 24, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME IN WHICH JOHNSON & JOHNSON AND JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC MAY RESPOND TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, P. R. J., J. J. (Williams, Marc) (Modified on 8/25/2021 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add party filers) (kew).
August 23, 2021 Filing 7 JOINT MOTION by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States for an Immediate Stay of All Further Proceedings Pending Transfer. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(George, Keith) (Modified on 8/23/2021 to remove link to #1 notice of removal) (kew).
August 23, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME IN WHICH WEST VIRGINIA BOARD OF PHARMACY MAY RESPOND TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by West Virginia Board of Pharmacy, P. R. J., J. J. (Taylor, Justin) (Modified on 8/23/2021 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add party filers) (kew).
August 20, 2021 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Williams, Marc)
August 20, 2021 Filing 4 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME IN WHICH MCKINSEY MAY RESPOND TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States, P. R. J., J. J. (George, Keith) (Modified on 8/23/2021 to add party filers) (kew).
August 20, 2021 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States (George, Keith)
August 20, 2021 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
August 19, 2021 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
August 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson with complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-8014467. (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket Sheet, #2 State Court Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (kew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J.J. et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. J.
Represented By: Alexander D. McLaughlin
Represented By: Benjamin D. Adams
Represented By: L. Dante DiTrapano
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: R. Booth Goodwin, II
Represented By: W. Stuart Calwell
Represented By: W. Jesse Forbes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P. R. J.
Represented By: Alexander D. McLaughlin
Represented By: Benjamin D. Adams
Represented By: L. Dante DiTrapano
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: R. Booth Goodwin, II
Represented By: W. Stuart Calwell
Represented By: W. Jesse Forbes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Alexander Chesney Frampton
Represented By: Marc E. Williams
Represented By: Robert L. Massie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Alexander Chesney Frampton
Represented By: Marc E. Williams
Represented By: Robert L. Massie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco
Represented By: Jon B. Orndorff
Represented By: Kelly Calder Mowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc. United States
Represented By: David S. Russo
Represented By: John C. Palmer, IV
Represented By: Keith J. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Virginia Board of Pharmacy
Represented By: Justin C. Taylor
Represented By: Michael W. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?