Clark et al v. AMCO Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Kathryn Clark and Jered Clark
Defendant: AMCO Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2022cv01698
Filed: March 16, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2022 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jered Clark, Kathryn Clark (Townsend, Eric) (Filed on 4/11/2022)
April 11, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Dylan Townsend as counsel for Plaintiffs Kathryn Clark and Jered Clark (Townsend, Eric) (Filed on 4/11/2022)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 6/14/2022 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Case Management Statement due by 6/7/2022. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/24/2022. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2022)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.Signed by the Clerk on March 22, 2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2022)
March 21, 2022 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2022)
March 18, 2022 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by AMCO Insurance Company.. (Zhang, Mengmeng) (Filed on 3/18/2022)
March 18, 2022 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by AMCO Insurance Company. (Zhang, Mengmeng) (Filed on 3/18/2022)
March 18, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AMCO Insurance Company re 3 Case Assigned by Intake,, #6 Notice (Other), #4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #1 Notice of Removal, #5 Errata Proof of Service on Plaintiffs' counsel by Email and U.S. Mail on 3/18/2022 (Zhang, Mengmeng) (Filed on 3/18/2022)
March 18, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE by AMCO Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice to Plaintiffs That Action Has Been Removed to Federal Court (Martin, Sonia) (Filed on 3/18/2022)
March 17, 2022 Filing 5 ERRATA re #1 Notice of Removal, by AMCO Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal)(Martin, Sonia) (Filed on 3/17/2022)
March 17, 2022 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/7/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/14/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2022)
March 17, 2022 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/31/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2022)
March 16, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMCO Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Allied Group Inc., Corporate Parent Allied Holdings (Delaware) Inc. for AMCO Insurance Company. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Martin, Sonia) (Filed on 3/16/2022)
March 16, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Civil Action from Sonoma County Superior Court. Their case number is SCV-270210. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-17000221). Filed byAMCO Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martin, Sonia) (Filed on 3/16/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark et al v. AMCO Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Clark
Represented By: Eric Dylan Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jered Clark
Represented By: Eric Dylan Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMCO Insurance Company
Represented By: Sonia Renee Martin
Represented By: Mengmeng Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?