Marquez v. The Hertz Corporation
Plaintiff: Gianni Marquez
Defendant: The Hertz Corporation
Case Number: 3:2022cv01816
Filed: March 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Entire Action Without Prejudice by Gianni Marquez (Feder, Daniel) (Filed on 4/14/2022)
March 23, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to The Hertz Corporation. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2022)
March 23, 2022 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 6/16/202 2. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/23/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2022)
March 23, 2022 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/6/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2022)
March 23, 2022 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet by Gianni Marquez . (Feder, Daniel) (Filed on 3/23/2022)
March 22, 2022 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Feder, Daniel) (Filed on 3/22/2022)
March 22, 2022 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Gianni Marquez . (Feder, Daniel) (Filed on 3/22/2022)
March 22, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against The Hertz Corporation ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17017173.). Filed byGianni Marquez. (Feder, Daniel) (Filed on 3/22/2022)
March 22, 2022 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect PDF attached. [err201] Please resubmit current Civil Cover Sheet JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 10/2020) from our website www.cand.uscourts.gov . No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Gianni Marquez (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marquez v. The Hertz Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gianni Marquez
Represented By: Daniel L. Feder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hertz Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?