Edwards v. FCA US LLC
Plaintiff: Stanley Edwards
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv01871
Filed: March 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Case Management Conference held on 10/18/2023. Total Time in Court: 5 minutes. Court Reporter: Marla Knox. Plaintiff Attorney: Elizabeth A. LaRocque. Defendant Attorney: James Mayo. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/18/2023)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Christopher Campbell. The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the document (dkt. #: #45 Notice of Appearance filed by Stanley Edwards ). Please update your personal profile on ECF. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher James Campbell (Campbell, Christopher) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Stanley Edwards and FCA US LLC. (LaRocque, Elizabeth) (Filed on 10/10/2023) Modified on 10/10/2023 (jml, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE by Stanley Edwards of withdrawal of counsel (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 7/20/2023)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE by Stanley Edwards of withdrawal of counsel (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 7/20/2023)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ann LaRocque (LaRocque, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/20/2023)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING ZOOM HEARING - Case Management Conference reset for 10/18/2023 02:00 PM via Videoconference. (Case Management Statement due by 10/11/2023). This proceeding will be held via Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2023)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Stanley Edwards and FCA US LLC. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 5/9/2023) Modified on 5/10/2023 (anj, COURT STAFF).
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Nino Sanaia (Sanaia, Nino) (Filed on 3/1/2023)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATES AND RELATED DEADLINES by Judge William H. Orrick granting #36 Stipulation. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/16/2023 02:00 PM via videoconference (Case Management Statement due by 5/9/2023). Close of Fact Discovery: 6/6/2023. Dispositive Motions to be heard by 10/18/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 1/8/2024 02:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 2/5/2024 08:30 AM, both in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2023)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue Trial and Related Dates filed by Stanley Edwards, FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration Ariel Harman-Holmes)(Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 1/20/2023) Modified on 1/23/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING ZOOM HEARING - Case Management Conference reset for 2/14/2023 02:00 PM via Videoconference (Case Management Statement due by 2/7/2023). This proceeding will be held via Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2023)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Reshma Amarlal Bajaj (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Bajaj, Reshma) (Filed on 1/12/2023)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Joint Mediation Status Report by Stanley Edwards and FCA US LLC. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 1/10/2023) Modified on 1/11/2023 (jml, COURT STAFF).
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. Judge initials are incorrect. Counsel need not re-file the document, but should reference the correct judge initials on future filings. Re: #32 Summons R eturned Executed filed by Stanley Edwards (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2022)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stanley Edwards. FCA US LLC served on 3/28/2022, answer due 4/18/2022. (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 7/6/2022)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ANSWER to Complaint byFCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Mayo, James) (Filed on 6/30/2022)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Case Management Conference held on 6/21/2022., Case referred to Private ADR. Deadline to amend/add parties: 8/29/2022. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/17/2023 02:00 PM via Videoconference (Case Management Statement due by 1/10/2023. Close of Fact Discovery due by 2/6/2023. Dispositive Motion due by 4/26/2023). Pretrial Conference set for 7/17/2023 02:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 8/21/2023 08:30 AM, both in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Total Time in Court: 6 minutes. Court Reporter: Joan Columbini. Plaintiff Attorney: Ariel S. Harmon-Holmes. Defendant Attorney: Spencer P. Hugret. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/21/2022)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Private ADR. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2022)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Rule 26(f)) filed by Stanley Edwards and FCA US LLC. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 6/14/2022) Modified on 6/15/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by James P. Mayo (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Mayo, James) (Filed on 6/10/2022)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Peter Hugret (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hugret, Spencer) (Filed on 6/10/2022)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #24 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Jon David Universal terminated. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2022)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING ZOOM HEARING - Case Management Conference reset for 6/21/2022 02:00 PM. This proceeding will be held via Zoom webinar. Case Management Statement due by 6/14/2022. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2022)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. Judge initials are incorrect. Counsel need not re-file the document, but should reference the correct judge name/initials on future filings. Re: #24 MOTI ON to Substitute Attorney filed by FCA US LLC (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2022)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] The correct event is Motion to Substitute Attorney. The correct event can be found at Civil Events > Motions and Relate d Filings > Motions - General > Substitute Attorney. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #24 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by FCA US LLC (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2022)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by James P. Mayo (Mayo, James) (Filed on 6/3/2022) Modified on 6/6/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DENYING #14 MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO STRIKE by Judge William H. Orrick. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2022)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE - Pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-1(b), it has been determined that the #14 Motion to Dismiss is appropriate for disposition without oral argument. As such, the hearing set for 5/25/2022 is VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2022)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine J Haw (Haw, Christine) (Filed on 5/24/2022)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPLY (re #14 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byFCA US LLC. (Mayo, James) (Filed on 5/18/2022)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #14 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byStanley Edwards. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 5/11/2022)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Ariel S. Harman-Holmes (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 4/26/2022)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon David Universal (Universal, Jon) (Filed on 4/18/2022)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by FCA US LLC identifying Corporate Parent FCA North America Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent FCA US LLC, Corporate Parent FCA Holdco B.V. for FCA US LLC. (Mayo, James) (Filed on 4/18/2022)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by FCA US LLC. (Mayo, James) (Filed on 4/18/2022)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by FCA US LLC. Motion Hearing set for 5/25/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 5/11/2022. Replies due by 5/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points & Authorities, #2 Declaration James P. Mayo, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of James P. Mayo, #4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of James P. Mayo, #5 Proposed Order)(Mayo, James) (Filed on 4/18/2022)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING ZOOM HEARING - Case Management Statement due by 6/7/2022. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 6/14/2022 02:00 PM. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by te lephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2022)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by FCA US LLC.. (Mayo, James) (Filed on 4/15/2022)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by James P. Mayo (Mayo, James) (Filed on 4/15/2022)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference reset for 6/21/2022 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Case Management Statement due by 6/14/2022. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 4/13/2022. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2022)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 04/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2022)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2022)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Stanley Edwards.. (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 4/8/2022)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/17/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/24/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2022)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to FCA US LLC. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2022)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/8/2022. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2022)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Stanley Edwards . (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 3/25/2022)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 3/24/2022)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violation of Statutory Obligations against FCA US LLC with jury demand( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17024300.). Filed by Stanley Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2109 Jeep Cherokee Express Warranty, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 3/24/2022) Modified on 3/28/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF).
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. Civil Cover Sheet has incorrect divisional office. Contra Costa County is San Francisco/Oakland Venue. No judge assignment will be made until the civil c over sheet is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Edwards
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Ariel S. Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Christine J Haw
Represented By: Nino Sanaia
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann LaRocque
Represented By: Christopher James Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: James P. Mayo
Represented By: Jon David Universal
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Represented By: Reshma Amarlal Bajaj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?