Watkins et al v. Truist Bank
Plaintiff: Monica Watkins and Christopher Watkins
Defendant: Truist Bank
Case Number: 3:2022cv02339
Filed: April 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Maxine M Chesney
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byTruist Bank. (Kamka, Mary) (Filed on 5/12/2022)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/29/2022 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/22/2022.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 5/3/2022. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2022)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 05/02/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2022)
May 2, 2022 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2022)
April 29, 2022 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Truist Bank.. (Kamka, Mary) (Filed on 4/29/2022)
April 29, 2022 Filing 7 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Truist Bank identifying Corporate Parent Truist Financial Corporation for Truist Bank. (Kamka, Mary) (Filed on 4/29/2022)
April 29, 2022 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Christopher Watkins, Monica Watkins.. (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 4/29/2022)
April 29, 2022 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2022)
April 20, 2022 Filing 4 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Truist Bank. (Kamka, Mary) (Filed on 4/20/2022)
April 15, 2022 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/12/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/19/2022 02:00 PM. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2022)
April 15, 2022 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/29/2022. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2022)
April 14, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lake County Superior Court. Their case number is CV-422734. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-17088315). Filed byTruist Bank. (Attachments: #1 * copy of Complaint attached - Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kamka, Mary) (Filed on 4/14/2022) Modified on 4/15/2022 (mcl, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watkins et al v. Truist Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Watkins
Represented By: Todd Michael Friedman
Represented By: Adrian R. Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Watkins
Represented By: Todd Michael Friedman
Represented By: Adrian R. Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truist Bank
Represented By: Mary Catherine Kamka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?