GN Audio A/S et al v. Snik LLC
Plaintiff: GN Audio A/S, GN Audio USA Inc., GN Store Nord A/S, GN Hearing A/S and GN Hearing Care Corporation
Defendant: Snik LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv02575
Filed: April 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting #16 Stipulation re Notice of Settlement and to Continue Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/1/2022 at 10:00 a.m., in San Francisco, - Zoom Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due by 8/25/2022. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2022)
June 21, 2022 Filing 16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO VACATE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Snik LLC. (Gantney, Laura) (Filed on 6/21/2022)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting #14 Stipulation extending time to file response to complaint. Extended to: 6/20/2022. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2022)
May 18, 2022 Filing 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend Time To Respond to Complaint filed by Snik LLC. (Kyle, John) (Filed on 5/18/2022)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Scott McKeown. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2022)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Matthew Rizzolo. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2022)
May 11, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice , re: Scott McKeown ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17164923.) filed by GN Audio A/S, GN Audio USA Inc., GN Hearing A/S, GN Hearing Care Corporation, GN Store Nord A/S. (McKeown, Scott) (Filed on 5/11/2022)
May 11, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice , re: Matthew Rizzolo ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17164844.) filed by GN Audio A/S, GN Audio USA Inc., GN Hearing A/S, GN Hearing Care Corporation, GN Store Nord A/S. (Rizzolo, Matthew) (Filed on 5/11/2022)
May 11, 2022 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by GN Audio A/S, GN Audio USA Inc., GN Hearing A/S, GN Hearing Care Corporation, GN Store Nord A/S.. (Chow, Keyna) (Filed on 5/11/2022)
May 6, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GN Hearing A/S, GN Audio A/S, GN Store Nord A/S, GN Audio USA Inc., GN Hearing Care Corporation. Snik LLC served on 4/29/2022, answer due 5/20/2022. (Chow, Keyna) (Filed on 5/6/2022)
April 29, 2022 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/21/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/28/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2022)
April 29, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Snik LLC. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2022)
April 28, 2022 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/12/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2022)
April 28, 2022 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by GN Audio A/S, GN Audio USA Inc., GN Hearing A/S, GN Hearing Care Corporation, GN Store Nord A/S identifying Corporate Parent GN Store Nord A/S for GN Audio A/S, GN Audio USA Inc., GN Hearing A/S, GN Hearing Care Corporation. (Chow, Keyna) (Filed on 4/28/2022)
April 28, 2022 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a Patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Chow, Keyna) (Filed on 4/28/2022)
April 28, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Chow, Keyna) (Filed on 4/28/2022)
April 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment of Non-Infringement against Snik LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17127004.). Filed byGN Hearing A/S, GN Audio A/S, GN Store Nord A/S, GN Audio USA Inc., GN Hearing Care Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chow, Keyna) (Filed on 4/28/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GN Audio A/S et al v. Snik LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GN Audio A/S
Represented By: Keyna Chow
Represented By: Matthew J Rizzolo
Represented By: Scott Anthony McKeown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GN Audio USA Inc.
Represented By: Keyna Chow
Represented By: Matthew J Rizzolo
Represented By: Scott Anthony McKeown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GN Store Nord A/S
Represented By: Keyna Chow
Represented By: Matthew J Rizzolo
Represented By: Scott Anthony McKeown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GN Hearing A/S
Represented By: Keyna Chow
Represented By: Matthew J Rizzolo
Represented By: Scott Anthony McKeown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GN Hearing Care Corporation
Represented By: Keyna Chow
Represented By: Matthew J Rizzolo
Represented By: Scott Anthony McKeown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snik LLC
Represented By: John Shepherd Kyle
Represented By: Laura K. Gantney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?