Nacarino et al v. Amazon.com, Inc.
Plaintiff: Elena Nacarino, Susan Sylvester and Michael Sonnenschein
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv02713
Filed: May 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Elena Nacarino, Michael Sonnenschein, Susan Sylvester (Deckant, Neal) (Filed on 6/28/2022)
June 24, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/11/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 7/15/2022. Replies due by 7/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A to Wakefield Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 6/24/2022)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/26/2022. (jdlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2022)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Brian D. Buckley. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2022)
May 20, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Brian Buckley ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17194383.) filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Buckley, Brian) (Filed on 5/20/2022)
May 19, 2022 Filing 18 Certificate of Interested Entities by Amazon.com, Inc. (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 5/19/2022)
May 19, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Alyssa Crooke (Crooke, Alyssa) (Filed on 5/19/2022)
May 19, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Rina Plotkin (Plotkin, Rina) (Filed on 5/19/2022)
May 19, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Esther D. Galan (Galan, Esther) (Filed on 5/19/2022)
May 19, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Garner F. Kropp (Kropp, Garner) (Filed on 5/19/2022)
May 19, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Irene Culp (Culp, Kimberly) (Filed on 5/19/2022)
May 19, 2022 Filing 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT AMAZON.COM, INC. TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT AND TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE (L.R. 6-1(a) AND 6-2) filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 5/19/2022)
May 19, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jedediah Wakefield (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 5/19/2022)
May 17, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elena Nacarino, Michael Sonnenschein, Susan Sylvester. Amazon.com, Inc. served on 5/12/2022, answer due 6/2/2022. (Deckant, Neal) (Filed on 5/17/2022)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/11/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 8/4/2022. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/11/2022. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2022)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 05/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2022)
May 10, 2022 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2022)
May 9, 2022 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Elena Nacarino, Michael Sonnenschein, Susan Sylvester.. (Deckant, Neal) (Filed on 5/9/2022)
May 6, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Amazon.com, Inc.. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2022)
May 6, 2022 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/1/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/8/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2022)
May 5, 2022 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/19/2022. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2022)
May 5, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Deckant, Neal) (Filed on 5/5/2022)
May 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amazon.com, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17149625.). Filed byElena Nacarino, Michael Sonnenschein, Susan Sylvester. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Deckant, Neal) (Filed on 5/5/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nacarino et al v. Amazon.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elena Nacarino
Represented By: Neal J. Deckant
Represented By: Frederick J. Klorczyk, III
Represented By: Julia Kathryn Venditti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Sylvester
Represented By: Neal J. Deckant
Represented By: Frederick J. Klorczyk, III
Represented By: Julia Kathryn Venditti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Sonnenschein
Represented By: Neal J. Deckant
Represented By: Frederick J. Klorczyk, III
Represented By: Julia Kathryn Venditti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By: Jedediah Wakefield
Represented By: Alyssa Crooke
Represented By: Brian David Buckley
Represented By: Esther D. Galan
Represented By: Garner F. Kropp
Represented By: Kimberly Irene Culp
Represented By: Rina Plotkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?