Rothschild Patent Imaging LLC v. Plex, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rothschild Patent Imaging LLC
Defendant: Plex, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv02756
Filed: May 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Rothschild Patent Imaging LLC (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 7/5/2022)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #17 Stipulation. (afm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2022)
July 1, 2022 Filing 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Plex, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Yeh, Mark) (Filed on 7/1/2022)
May 31, 2022 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR 8/11/2022 AT 11:00AM: Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/4/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/11/2022 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2022)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #14 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond to the Complaint by 30 Days. (afm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2022)
May 26, 2022 Filing 14 JOINT STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Plex, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Yeh, Mark) (Filed on 5/26/2022) Modified on 5/27/2022 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE AND ORDER RE PROCEDURE FOR PATENT CASES. SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2022)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 05/24/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2022)
May 24, 2022 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2022)
May 24, 2022 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Rothschild Patent Imaging LLC.. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 5/24/2022)
May 17, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rothschild Patent Imaging LLC. Plex, Inc. served on 5/11/2022, answer due 6/1/2022. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 5/17/2022)
May 10, 2022 Filing 8 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2022)
May 10, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Plex, Inc.. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2022)
May 10, 2022 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/1/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/8/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2022)
May 10, 2022 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/24/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2022)
May 10, 2022 Filing 4 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Rothschild Patent Imaging LLC identifying Corporate Parent Patent Asset Management LLC for Rothschild Patent Imaging LLC. re #1 Complaint, (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 5/10/2022)
May 10, 2022 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 5/10/2022)
May 10, 2022 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 5/10/2022)
May 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Plex, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17158984.). Filed byRothschild Patent Imaging LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 5/10/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rothschild Patent Imaging LLC v. Plex, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rothschild Patent Imaging LLC
Represented By: Stephen Michael Lobbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plex, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Yeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?