Ryan et al v. The Good Fat Co. Ltd.
Plaintiff: Paul Ryan and Michelle Pimentel
Defendant: The Good Fat Co. Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2022cv03391
Filed: June 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2022 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Michelle Pimentel, Paul Ryan.. (Gustafson, John) (Filed on 7/18/2022)
July 18, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to The Good Fat Co. Ltd.. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2022)
July 18, 2022 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Keeton, Steffan) (Filed on 7/18/2022)
July 15, 2022 Filing 5 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 7/29/20221. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/29/2022. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2022)
June 24, 2022 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 7/8/2022. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/8/2022. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2022)
June 9, 2022 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/5/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2022)
June 9, 2022 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/23/2022. (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2022)
June 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION against All Defendants with jury demand (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17248897.). Filed by Paul Ryan, Michelle Pimentel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gustafson, John) (Filed on 6/8/2022) Modified on 6/9/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/18/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ryan et al v. The Good Fat Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Ryan
Represented By: John Ryan Gustafson
Represented By: Steffan T. Keeton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Pimentel
Represented By: John Ryan Gustafson
Represented By: Steffan T. Keeton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Good Fat Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?