Pebble Beach Company v. UMRO Realty Corp.
Plaintiff: Pebble Beach Company
Defendant: UMRO Realty Corp. doing business as The Agency
Case Number: 3:2022cv03438
Filed: June 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Pebble Beach Company. Service waived by UMRO Realty Corp. waiver sent on 7/18/2022, answer due 9/16/2022. (Seraphine, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/27/2022)
June 13, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to UMRO Realty Corp. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2022)
June 13, 2022 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 9/7/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/14/2022 01:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2022)
June 10, 2022 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Vince Chhabria. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2022)
June 10, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pebble Beach Company (Seraphine, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/10/2022)
June 10, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Seraphine, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/10/2022)
June 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for (1) Federal Trademark Infringement, 15 U.S.C. 1114 (Count I); (2) Federal Trade Dress Infringement, 15 U.S.C. 1125 (Count II); (3) Federal Unfair Competition, False Endorsement, False Association, and False Designation of Origin, 15 U.S.C. 1125 (Count III); (4) Common Law Trademark Infringement (Count IV); (5) Trademark Dilution, Cal. Bus. and Prof. Code 14247 (Count V); (6) Trade Dress Dilution, Cal. Bus. and Prof. Code 14247 (Count VI); (7) Unfair Competition, Cal. Bus. and Prof. Code 17200 (Count VII); (8) False and Deceptive Advertising, Cal. Bus. and Prof. Code 17500 (Count VIII) against UMRO Realty Corp. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17254912.). Filed byPebble Beach Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seraphine, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/10/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pebble Beach Company v. UMRO Realty Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pebble Beach Company
Represented By: Jennifer Seraphine
Represented By: Jacob S. Zweig
Represented By: Vyson Hsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UMRO Realty Corp. doing business as The Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?