CLAY v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: TOMMIE L. CLAY
Defendant: FCA US LLC and ANTIOCH CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE
Case Number: 3:2022cv03676
Filed: June 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Maxine M Chesney
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher James Campbell (Campbell, Christopher) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
July 20, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE by Tommie L. Clay of withdrawal of counsel (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 7/20/2023)
July 20, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ann LaRocque (LaRocque, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/20/2023)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/16/2022. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2022)
December 16, 2022 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Maxine M. Chesney: Initial Case Management Conference held by Zoom on 12/16/2022. Case referred to Private ADR. Amended Pleadings due by 3/1/2023. Close of Fact Discovery due by 11/28/2023. Designation of Experts due by 12/5/2023. Rebuttal Reports due by 12/19/2023. Close of Expert Discovery due by 1/2/2024. Dispositive Motion due by 1/19/2024. Further Status Conference set for 3/22/2024 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Joint Status Conference Statement due by 3/15/2024. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/28/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Jury Selection/Jury Trial (5-7 days) set for 6/10/2024 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Digital Recording Time: 10:50-11:09 - Zoom Recording. Plaintiff Attorney: Daniel Law. Defendant Attorney: Nijla Nassirian. Attachment: Civil Minutes. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/16/2022)
December 16, 2022 CASE REFERRED to Private ADR. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2022)
December 9, 2022 Filing 22 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Tommie L. Clay. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 12/9/2022)
November 23, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Ariel S. Harman-Holmes (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 11/23/2022)
November 17, 2022 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE CONVERTING THE DECEMBER 16, 2022 AT 10:30 AM - INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - TO A ZOOM WEBINAR. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/16/2022 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/mmc General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/16/2022 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.),.(tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2022)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 18, 2022. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2022)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT FCA US LLC TO SUBMIT COURTESY COPIES IN COMPLIANCE WITH COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 5, 2022. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2022)
October 4, 2022 Filing 17 REPLY (re #12 MOTION to Remand ) filed byTommie L. Clay. (Law, Daniel) (Filed on 10/4/2022)
September 29, 2022 Filing 16 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #12 MOTION to Remand ) filed byFCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nejla Nassirian, #2 Exhibit A to NN's Decl, #3 Exhibit B to NN's Decl, #4 Exhibit C to NN's Decl, #5 Exhibit D to NN's Decl, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Nassirian, Nejla) (Filed on 9/29/2022)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference currently scheduled for September 30, 2022, is continued to December 16, 2022, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement shall be filed no later than December 9, 2022. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 21, 2022. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2022)
September 21, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines:, Set/Reset Hearing re #15 Order, Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/9/2022. Initial Case Management Conference reset to 12/16/2022 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2022)
September 19, 2022 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE CONVERTING THE OCTOBER 21, 2022 AT 9:00 AM MOTION HEARING TO A ZOOM WEBINAR. As to #12 MOTION to Remand . Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2022 at 09:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.c and.uscourts.gov/mmc General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2022 at 09:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.),(tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2022)
September 13, 2022 Filing 13 Request for Judicial Notice re #12 MOTION to Remand filed byTommie L. Clay. (Related document(s) #12 ) (Law, Daniel) (Filed on 9/13/2022)
September 13, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand filed by Tommie L. Clay. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2022 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 9/27/2022. Replies due by 10/4/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #3 Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Remand)(Law, Daniel) (Filed on 9/13/2022)
August 16, 2022 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE CONVERTING THE SEPTEMBER 30, 2022 AT 10:30 AM INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO A ZOOM WEBINAR. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/30/2022 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/mmc General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/30/2022 at 10:30 AM in San Franc isco, - Videoconference Only. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.),.(tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2022)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/30/2022 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/23/2022.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 7/5/2022. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2022)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT FCA US LLC TO SUBMIT COURTESY COPIES OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL AND DECLARATION IN SUPPORT THEREOF. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 29, 2022. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2022)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 06/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2022)
June 28, 2022 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2022)
June 28, 2022 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by FCA US LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Nassirian, Nejla) (Filed on 6/28/2022)
June 23, 2022 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/7/2022. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2022)
June 22, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Nejla Nassirian (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Nassirian, Nejla) (Filed on 6/22/2022)
June 22, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Peter Hugret (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer) (Filed on 6/22/2022)
June 22, 2022 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by FCA US LLC identifying Corporate Parent FCA North America Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent FCA North America Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent FCA US LLC, Corporate Parent FCA Holdco B.V., Corporate Parent Stellantis N.V. (formerly known as Fiat Chrysler Automobiles, N.V.) for FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer) (Filed on 6/22/2022)
June 22, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is 21cv003982. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number-17287478). Filed byFCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Atty iso Removal, #2 Exhibit A to Atty Decl, #3 Exhibit B to Atty Decl, #4 Exhibit C to Atty Decl, #5 Exhibit D to Atty Decl, #6 Exhibit E to Atty Decl, #7 Exhibit F to Atty Decl, #8 Exhibit G to Atty Decl, #9 Exhibit H to Atty Decl, #10 Exhibit I to Atty Decl, #11 Exhibit J to Atty Decl, #12 Exhibit K to Atty Decl, #13 Exhibit L to Atty Decl, #14 Exhibit M to Atty Decl, #15 Exhibit N to Atty Decl, #16 Exhibit O to Atty Decl, #17 Exhibit P to Atty Decl, #18 Exhibit Q to Atty Decl, #19 Exhibit R to Atty Decl, #20 Exhibit S to Atty Decl, #21 Exhibit T to Atty Decl, #22 Exhibit U to Atty Decl, #23 Exhibit V to Atty Decl, #24 Exhibit W to Atty Decl, #25 Exhibit X to Atty Decl, #26 Exhibit Y to Atty Decl, #27 Exhibit Z to Atty Decl, #28 Exhibit AA to Atty Decl, #29 Exhibit BB to Atty Decl, #30 Exhibit CC to Atty Decl, #31 Exhibit DD to Atty Decl, #32 Civil Cover Sheet, #33 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer) (Filed on 6/22/2022) Modified on 6/22/2022 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
June 22, 2022 State Court Answers filed re #1 Exhibit G and Exhibit M (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CLAY v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOMMIE L. CLAY
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Daniel A. Law
Represented By: Ariel S. Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann LaRocque
Represented By: Christopher James Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Nejla Nassirian
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTIOCH CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?