Taylor v. Nations Direct Mortgage, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Robert Taylor
Defendant: Nations Direct Mortgage, LLC and ZBS LAW, LLP
Case Number: 3:2022cv03914
Filed: July 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1640 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #26 Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Preliminary Injunction Hearing and Deadline to Respond to Complaint. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2022)
July 25, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING. Please take notice the Preliminary Injunction Hearing is scheduled to September 29, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Zoom videoconference.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc General Order 58. Perso ns granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2022)
July 22, 2022 Filing 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Nations Direct Mortgage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Joint Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Preliminary Injunction Hearing and Deadline to Respond to Complaint)(Kozinska, Magdalena) (Filed on 7/22/2022)
July 7, 2022 Filing 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Status Conference held and recorded by Zoom videoconference on 7/7/2022. The Court sets the following briefing schedule for Plaintiff's Motion to Preliminary Injunction: Defendant's opposition is due by 7/28/2022. Plaintiff's reply is due by 8/4/2022. The Court will hear arguments on 8/11/2022 at 10:00 a.m. by Zoom videoconference. The TRO shall remain in place until the hearing on the preliminary injunction. (Digital Recording Time: 2:32-2:38)Attorney for Plaintiff: Richard SaxAttorney for Defendants: Magdalena Kozinska Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/7/2022) Modified on 7/8/2022 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
July 7, 2022 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robert Taylor re #23 Declaration in Support, #22 Certificate of Service, #21 Order on Ex Parte Application (Proof of Personal Service upon ZBS Law, LLP), AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Robert Taylor. (Sax, Richard) (Filed on 7/7/2022)
July 7, 2022 Filing 23 Declaration of Richard Sax in Support of #22 Certificate of Service, #21 Order on Ex Parte Application re Service Upon Defendants filed byRobert Taylor. (Related document(s) #22 , #21 ) (Sax, Richard) (Filed on 7/7/2022)
July 7, 2022 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robert Taylor re #21 Order on Ex Parte Application Attesting to Service Upon Nations Direct Mortgage, LLC (Sax, Richard) (Filed on 7/7/2022)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting [ #15 Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order.(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2022)
July 6, 2022 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 10/6/2022 at 1:30 p.m. before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley via a Zoom webinar. Case Management Statement due by 9/29/2022.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at jsccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than by noon on 10/5/2022.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2022)
July 6, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING BY ZOOM VIDEOCONFERENCE. The Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 7/7/2022 at 2:30 p.m. before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties w ho wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at jsccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 5:00 p.m. on 7/6/2022.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2022)
July 5, 2022 Filing 19 Proposed Order re #15 Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order Pending Hearing on Preliminary Injunction: L.R. 7-10, L.R. 65-1 and FRCP 65(b) by Robert Taylor. (Sax, Richard) (Filed on 7/5/2022)
July 5, 2022 Filing 18 Brief re #15 Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order Pending Hearing on Preliminary Injunction: L.R. 7-10, L.R. 65-1 and FRCP 65(b) (Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Ex Parte Motion) filed byRobert Taylor. (Related document(s) #15 ) (Sax, Richard) (Filed on 7/5/2022)
July 5, 2022 Filing 17 Declaration of Robert Taylor in Support of #15 Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order Pending Hearing on Preliminary Injunction: L.R. 7-10, L.R. 65-1 and FRCP 65(b) filed byRobert Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Related document(s) #15 ) (Sax, Richard) (Filed on 7/5/2022)
July 5, 2022 Filing 16 Declaration of Richard Sax in Support of #15 Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order Pending Hearing on Preliminary Injunction: L.R. 7-10, L.R. 65-1 and FRCP 65(b) (Declaration re Ex Parte Notice) filed byRobert Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #15 ) (Sax, Richard) (Filed on 7/5/2022)
July 5, 2022 Filing 15 Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order Pending Hearing on Preliminary Injunction: L.R. 7-10, L.R. 65-1 and FRCP 65(b) filed by Robert Taylor. (Sax, Richard) (Filed on 7/5/2022)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 07/05/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2022)
July 5, 2022 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2022)
July 5, 2022 Filing 12 Proposed Order re #8 Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order Pending Hearing on Preliminary Injunction by Robert Taylor. (Sax, Richard) (Filed on 7/5/2022)
July 5, 2022 Filing 11 Brief re #8 Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order Pending Hearing on Preliminary Injunction (Memorandum of Points and Authorities) filed byRobert Taylor. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Sax, Richard) (Filed on 7/5/2022)
July 5, 2022 Filing 10 Declaration of Robert Taylor in Support of #8 Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order Pending Hearing on Preliminary Injunction filed byRobert Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Related document(s) #8 ) (Sax, Richard) (Filed on 7/5/2022)
July 5, 2022 Filing 9 Declaration in Support of #8 Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order Pending Hearing on Preliminary Injunction filed byRobert Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #8 ) (Sax, Richard) (Filed on 7/5/2022)
July 5, 2022 Filing 8 Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order Pending Hearing on Preliminary Injunction filed by Robert Taylor. (Sax, Richard) (Filed on 7/5/2022)
July 5, 2022 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/28/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/5/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2022)
July 5, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to ZBS LAW, LLP. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2022)
July 5, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Nations Direct Mortgage, LLC. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2022)
July 4, 2022 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/18/2022. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/4/2022)
July 4, 2022 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Sax, Richard) (Filed on 7/4/2022)
July 4, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Sax, Richard) (Filed on 7/4/2022)
July 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violations of the Truth in Lending Act (TILA), Violations of the Dodd-Frank Act, Declaratory Relief, Unfair Business Practices, Breach of Contract, Negligent Review of Loan Modification, Injunctive Relief and Damages; Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17319222.). Filed byRobert Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sax, Richard) (Filed on 7/4/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Nations Direct Mortgage, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Taylor
Represented By: Richard Philip Sax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nations Direct Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Magdalena D. Kozinska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZBS LAW, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?