Saiindia et al v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: SHEILA SAIIDNIA and A&S ENGINEERS, INC.
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 3:2022cv03943
Filed: July 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2023 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher James Campbell (Campbell, Christopher) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
August 16, 2023 Filing 44 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson: Telephone Conference re scheduling a Settlement Conference held on 8/16/2023 at 2:30 p.m.Digital Recording Time: Not Recorded. Plaintiff Attorney: Christopher Campbell. Defendant Attorney: Eric D. Sentlinger. Parties presently in private mediation and have a settlement recommendation from Mediator. Court recommended scheduling a Settlement Conference hearing in the interim if the settlement does not occur. If counsel settles between now and Settlement Conference date they may contact the Court and vacate the hearing.Proceedings: Telephone conference held on 8/16/2023 to schedule a date for Settlement Conference. Proposed Settlement Conference dates: 1/23/2024 or 1/24/2024 at 10:00 a.m., In Person hearing at 450 Golden Gate Avenue, SF, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. Counsel shall check with their clients/representatives re which dates or date is available for the Settlement Conference. By COB on Tuesday, 8/22/2023, counsel shall email the Courtroom Deputy, Rose Maher and let her know if both dates or which single date, 1/23/2024 or 1/24/2024, is available to schedule the Settlement Conference. Courtroom Deputy email: Rose_Maher@cand.uscourts.gov (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/16/2023)
August 14, 2023 Filing 43 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ford Motor Company.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lambert, Sarah) (Filed on 8/14/2023)
August 11, 2023 Filing 42 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pre-Settlement Conference Telephone Call: This case has been referred for Settlement Conference to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. A Pre-Settlement Conference Telephone Call is scheduled for: 8/16/2023 at 2:30 P.M. Counsel shall be prepared to speak about the status of this case and to talk about the Settlement Conference and schedule a date for the Settlement Conference. Counsel shall call the following conference call number: 1-888-684-8852/Access Code: 2925506 (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2023)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge (random) for Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/11/2023. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2023)
August 11, 2023 Filing 40 CLERK'S NOTICE - The CMC set for 08/15/2023 is VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2023)
August 11, 2023 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson for Settlement (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2023)
August 8, 2023 Filing 39 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Fourth filed by Sheila Saiidnia. (LaRocque, Elizabeth) (Filed on 8/8/2023)
August 2, 2023 Filing 38 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Gurpreet Sandhu and Request to Remove Counsel from Electronic Service List (Sandhu, Gurpreet) (Filed on 8/2/2023)
July 20, 2023 Filing 37 NOTICE by A&S Engineers, Inc., Sheila Saiidnia of withdrawal of counsel (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 7/20/2023)
July 20, 2023 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ann LaRocque (LaRocque, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/20/2023)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #34 Stipulation to Continue Dates. Close of Fact Discovery: 9/28/2023. Dispositive Motions to be heard by 11/29/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2024 02:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 3/4/2024 08:30 AM, both in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2023)
June 29, 2023 Filing 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE filed by Sheila Saiidnia, Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Elizabeth A. Larocoue in Support of Stipulation)(LaRocque, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/29/2023) Modified on 6/30/2023 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/30/2023 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 29, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance of Elizabeth Ann LaRocque as Counsel for Shiela Saiindia (LaRocque, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/29/2023) Modified on 6/30/2023 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2023 Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Case Management Conference held on 5/9/2023. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/15/2023 02:00 PM via Videoconference (Case Management Statement due by 8/8/2023). Total Time in Court: 6 minutes. Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez. Plaintiff Attorney: Michael L. Tracy. Defendant Attorney: Eric D. Sentlinger. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/9/2023)
May 9, 2023 Filing 31 STATUS REPORT THIRD, AMENDED by A&S ENGINEERS, INC., SHEILA SAIIDNIA. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 5/9/2023)
May 2, 2023 Filing 30 JOINT STATUS REPORT Third filed by A&S ENGINEERS, INC., SHEILA SAIIDNIA. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 5/2/2023) Modified text on 5/3/2023 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Nino Sanaia (Sanaia, Nino) (Filed on 4/28/2023)
April 20, 2023 Filing 28 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING ZOOM HEARING - Case Management Conference reset for 5/9/2023 02:00 PM (Case Management Statement due by 5/2/2023). This proceeding will be held via Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2023)
April 18, 2023 Filing 27 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by SHEILA SAIIDNIA. (Tracy, Michael) (Filed on 4/18/2023)
March 28, 2023 Filing 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Case Management Conference held on 3/28/2023. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2023 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Case Management Statement due by 4/18/2023. Digital Recording Time: 2:10-2:15. Plaintiff Attorney: Michael Tracy. Defendant Attorney: Eric D. Sentlinger. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/28/2023)
March 28, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Lion Tracy for Plaintiffs (Tracy, Michael) (Filed on 3/28/2023)
March 28, 2023 Filing 24 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. The Case Management Conference set for 3/28/2023 at 2:00 p.m. will be held via Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2023)
October 4, 2022 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Case Management Conference held on 10/4/2022. Case referred to Private ADR. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/28/2023 02:00 PM via Videoconference (Case Management Statement due by 3/21/2023). Close of Fact Discovery: 6/29/2023. Dispositive Motions to be heard by 8/30/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 11/13/2023 02:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 12/11/2023 08:30 AM, both in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Digital Recording Time: 2:57-3:01. Plaintiff Attorney: Ariel S. Harmon-Holmes. Defendant Attorney: Gupreet Sandu. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/4/2022)
October 4, 2022 CASE REFERRED to Private ADR. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2022)
October 3, 2022 Filing 22 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING - The Case Management Conference set for 10/4/2022 02:00 PM will be held via Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, a nd rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourt s.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2022)
September 27, 2022 Filing 21 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by A&S ENGINEERS, INC., SHEILA SAIIDNIA, Ford Motor Company. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 9/27/2022) Modified on 9/28/2022 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2022 Filing 20 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Sandhu, Gurpreet) (Filed on 9/14/2022)
September 14, 2022 Filing 19 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 9/14/2022)
September 14, 2022 Filing 18 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2022)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 10/4/2022 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Case Management Statement due by 9/27/2022. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/19/2022. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2022)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 08/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2022)
August 18, 2022 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2022)
August 17, 2022 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ford Motor Company identifying Corporate Parent State Street Corporation (parent of State Street Bank and Trust Company, which is the trustee of the Ford defined contribution plans), Other Affiliate Evercore Trust Company, N.A. (fiduciary of the Ford defined contribution plan), Other Affiliate Black Rock, Inc. and certain affiliates, Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group and certain affiliates for Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sandhu, Gurpreet) (Filed on 8/17/2022)
August 17, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint byFord Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sandhu, Gurpreet) (Filed on 8/17/2022)
August 17, 2022 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ford Motor Company.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sentlinger, Eric) (Filed on 8/17/2022)
August 17, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Peter Hugret (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer) (Filed on 8/17/2022)
August 17, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Gurpreet Sandhu (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sandhu, Gurpreet) (Filed on 8/17/2022)
August 17, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Dean Sentlinger (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sentlinger, Eric) (Filed on 8/17/2022)
August 8, 2022 Filing 8 SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 8/22/2022. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2022)
July 29, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SHEILA SAIIDNIA. Ford Motor Company served on 7/27/2022, answer due 8/17/2022. (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 7/29/2022)
July 22, 2022 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 8/5/2022. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2022)
July 6, 2022 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/28/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/5/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2022)
July 6, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ford Motor Company. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2022)
July 5, 2022 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/19/2022. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2022)
July 5, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 7/5/2022)
July 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF STATUTORY OBLIGATIONS against Ford Motor Company with jury demand ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17323254.). Filed by SHEILA SAIIDNIA, A&S ENGINEERS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 7/5/2022) Modified on 7/6/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saiindia et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHEILA SAIIDNIA
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Ariel S. Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Michael Lion Tracy
Represented By: Nino Sanaia
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann LaRocque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A&S ENGINEERS, INC.
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Ariel S. Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Michael Lion Tracy
Represented By: Nino Sanaia
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann LaRocque
Represented By: Christopher James Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Eric Dean Sentlinger
Represented By: Gurpreet Sandhu
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Represented By: Sarah Marie Carlson Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?