G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC v. Benjamin et al
Defendant: Ali Benjamin individually and d/b/a Project Fitness Benjamin's Boxing, Project Fitness Benjamin's Boxing an unknown business entity d/b/a Project Fitness Benjamin's Boxing, Ali Benjamin individually doing business as Project Fitness Benjamin's Boxing and Project Fitness Benjamin's Boxing an unknown business entity doing business as Project Fitness Benjamin's Boxing
Counter Defendant: G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC
Counter Claimant: Project Fitness Benjamin's Boxing and Ali Benjamin
Case Number: 3:2022cv04144
Filed: July 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed Question: Fed Communications Act of 1934
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2022 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/11/2022. Initial Case Management Conference CONTINUED TO 11/18/2022 at 02:30 PM - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at sicrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 11/9/22 at 2 pm.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/si General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Case Management Statement d ue by 11/11/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2022 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (ec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2022). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 2, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to Strike Answer, In Part, Counterclaim, In Part, and Affirmative Defenses filed by G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 9/16/2022. Replies due by 9/23/2022. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Proposed Order)(Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 9/2/2022)
September 2, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Counterclaim Pursuant to California's Anti-Slapp Statute, Code Civ. Proc 425.16 filed by G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 9/16/2022. Replies due by 9/23/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 9/2/2022)
September 2, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaim for Failure to State a Claim filed by G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 9/16/2022. Replies due by 9/23/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 9/2/2022)
August 23, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC. Project Fitness Benjamin's Boxing served on 7/22/2022, answer due 8/12/2022. (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 8/23/2022)
August 17, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC. Ali Benjamin served on 7/27/2022, answer due 8/17/2022. (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 8/17/2022)
August 12, 2022 Filing 11 3:22-cv-04144-si ANSWER to Complaint with Jury trial , First COUNTERCLAIM Emotional distress against All Plaintiffs byProject Fitness Benjamin's Boxing, Ali Benjamin. (Benjamin, Ali) (Filed on 8/12/2022)
July 20, 2022 Filing 10 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT GUIDELINE AND CLERK'S NOTICE ON REASSIGNMENT: Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/7/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/14/2022 at 02:30 PM - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at sicrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 10/5/2022 at 2 pm.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/si General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Case Management Statement due by 10/7/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/14/2022 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (ec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2022)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 07/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2022)
July 20, 2022 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2022)
July 19, 2022 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC.. (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 7/19/2022)
July 15, 2022 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/6/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/13/2022 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2022)
July 15, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Ali Benjamin, Project Fitness Benjamin's Boxing. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2022)
July 14, 2022 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/28/2022. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2022)
July 14, 2022 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 7/14/2022)
July 14, 2022 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 7/14/2022)
July 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against (Filing Fee paid of $402.00. Receipt # ACANDC-17351974) All Defendants. Filed by G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 7/14/2022) Modified on 7/15/2022 (bw, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC v. Benjamin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ali Benjamin individually and d/b/a Project Fitness Benjamin's Boxing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Project Fitness Benjamin's Boxing an unknown business entity d/b/a Project Fitness Benjamin's Boxing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ali Benjamin individually doing business as Project Fitness Benjamin's Boxing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Project Fitness Benjamin's Boxing an unknown business entity doing business as Project Fitness Benjamin's Boxing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Project Fitness Benjamin's Boxing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Ali Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?