Thames v. Mars, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jenile Thames
Defendant: Mars, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv04145
Filed: July 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/29/2022. (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2022)
August 26, 2022 Filing 16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Mars, Inc.. (Horniak, David) (Filed on 8/26/2022)
August 19, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Jenile Thames. Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 9/2/2022. Replies due by 9/9/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of L. Timothy Fisher, #2 Proposed Order)(Fisher, L.) (Filed on 8/19/2022)
August 5, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen David Raber (Raber, Stephen) (Filed on 8/5/2022)
August 5, 2022 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by Mars, Inc. (Horniak, David) (Filed on 8/5/2022)
August 5, 2022 Filing 12 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by Mars, Inc.. (Horniak, David) (Filed on 8/5/2022)
August 5, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David Michael Horniak on behalf of Mars, Incorporated (Horniak, David) (Filed on 8/5/2022)
July 28, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jenile Thames. Mars, Inc. served on 7/20/2022, answer due 8/10/2022. (Fisher, L.) (Filed on 7/28/2022)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/13/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 10/6/2022. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/20/2022. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2022)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 07/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2022)
July 18, 2022 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2022)
July 18, 2022 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jenile Thames.. (Fisher, L.) (Filed on 7/18/2022)
July 15, 2022 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/6/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/13/2022 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2022)
July 15, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Mars, Inc.. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2022)
July 15, 2022 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/29/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2022)
July 14, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Fisher, L.) (Filed on 7/14/2022)
July 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mars, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17352426.). Filed byJenile Thames. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fisher, L.) (Filed on 7/14/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thames v. Mars, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenile Thames
Represented By: L. Timothy Fisher
Represented By: Elvia Lopez
Represented By: Sean L. Litteral
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mars, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen David Raber
Represented By: David Michael Horniak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?