Woodruff et al v. Atlas Van Lines, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Katie Woodruff and Matt Childers
Defendant: Atlas Van Lines, Inc., Altair Global Services LLC and Stanley G. Alexander, Inc. a California corporation doing business as Alexander's Mobility Services
Case Number: 3:2022cv04194
Filed: July 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 49 U.S.C. ยง 81 Damaged Goods While Being Transported
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2022 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Count III of Plaintiff's Complaint byAltair Global Services LLC, Atlas Van Lines, Inc., Stanley G. Alexander, Inc.. (Garfinkel, Gregg) (Filed on 9/16/2022)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REGARDING MOTION TO DISMISS #14 . Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on August 26, 2022. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2022)
August 5, 2022 Filing 14 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #4 First MOTION to Dismiss Counts 1, 2 and 4 of Plaintiffs' Complaint pursuant to Fed.R. Civ.P 12(b)(6) ) Statement of Non-Opposition filed byMatt Childers, Katie Woodruff. (Wilson, Kurt) (Filed on 8/5/2022)
August 4, 2022 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by Matt Childers, Katie Woodruff (Wilson, Kurt) (Filed on 8/4/2022)
August 4, 2022 Filing 12 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options of Matt Childers (Wilson, Kurt) (Filed on 8/4/2022)
August 4, 2022 Filing 11 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options of Katie Woodruff (Wilson, Kurt) (Filed on 8/4/2022)
August 1, 2022 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The initial case management conference set for October 20, 2022 at 1:30 p.m. before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel o r parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at jsccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than noon on October 19, 2022.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no docume nt associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2022)
August 1, 2022 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING MOTION HEARING DATE.The hearing on Defendants' #4 Motion to Dismiss is advanced to August 31, 2022 at 9:00 a.m. before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counse l or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at jsccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than noon on August 30, 2022.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2022)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 08/01/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2022)
August 1, 2022 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2022)
July 26, 2022 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Altair Global Services LLC, Atlas Van Lines, Inc... (Garfinkel, Gregg) (Filed on 7/26/2022)
July 22, 2022 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs and Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/29/2022. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2022)
July 22, 2022 Filing 4 First MOTION to Dismiss Counts 1, 2 and 4 of Plaintiffs' Complaint pursuant to Fed.R. Civ.P 12(b)(6) filed by Altair Global Services LLC, Atlas Van Lines, Inc., Stanley G. Alexander, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/1/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 8/5/2022. Replies due by 8/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order re Motion to Dismiss)(Garfinkel, Gregg) (Filed on 7/22/2022)
July 19, 2022 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/11/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/18/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2022)
July 19, 2022 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/2/2022. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2022)
July 19, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marin County Superior Court. Their case number is CIV2201843. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-17363890). Filed byAltair Global Services LLC, Atlas Van Lines, Inc., Stanley G. Alexander, Inc. dba Alexander's Mobility Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Garfinkel, Gregg) (Filed on 7/19/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodruff et al v. Atlas Van Lines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katie Woodruff
Represented By: Kurt E. Wilson
Represented By: Kurt Edward Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Childers
Represented By: Kurt E. Wilson
Represented By: Kurt Edward Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlas Van Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Gregg S. Garfinkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altair Global Services LLC
Represented By: Gregg S. Garfinkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley G. Alexander, Inc. a California corporation doing business as Alexander's Mobility Services
Represented By: Gregg S. Garfinkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?