Newlands v. Philo, Inc.
Plaintiff: James Newlands
Defendant: Philo, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv04296
Filed: July 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Trina L Thompson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2022 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Certificate of Service by Douglas I. Cuthbertson on behalf of James Newlands (Cuthbertson, Douglas) (Filed on 9/19/2022)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order by Judge Trina L. Thompson granting #29 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Blake Steinberg. (bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2022)
September 16, 2022 Filing 29 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Blake J. Steinberg ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17543057.) filed by Philo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Steinberg, Blake) (Filed on 9/16/2022)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order by Trina L Thompson granting #27 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to David Yohai. (bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2022)
September 7, 2022 Filing 27 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17512437.) filed by Philo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Yohai, David) (Filed on 9/7/2022)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order by Trina L Thompson granting #25 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Ian Bensberg. (bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2022)
September 2, 2022 Filing 25 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Ian R. Bensberg ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17501710.) filed by James Newlands. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (Indiana))(Bensberg, Ian) (Filed on 9/2/2022)
August 29, 2022 Case Reassigned to Judge Trina L Thompson. Judge Judge Richard Seeborg no longer assigned to the case. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2022)
August 29, 2022 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Philo, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Andrew McCollum, Other Affiliate Discovery Communications, LLC, Other Affiliate Scripps Networks, LLC, Other Affiliate Home Box Office, Inc., Other Affiliate Flybridge Capital Partners III, L.P., Other Affiliate New Enterprise Associates 13, L.P., Other Affiliate AMC Networks Ventures LLC, Other Affiliate Rho Ventures VI, L.P., Other Affiliate CBC New Media Group, LLC, Other Affiliate A+E Ventures, LLC, Other Affiliate Experiment Fund, LLC, Other Affiliate Radical Investments LP, Other Affiliate NEA: Seed LLC, Other Affiliate Gaingels Philo CL LLC, Other Affiliate XFund2, Other Affiliate Felicis Ventures III, L.P., Other Affiliate WME Investments, LLC, Other Affiliate Jack Abraham, Other Affiliate Gaingels Philo LLC, Other Affiliate Fios Venture Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate XFund2A, Other Affiliate PH Fund I, a series of Riverside Ventures, LP, Other Affiliate Viacom International Inc. for. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Civil Local Rule 3-15 (Singh, David) (Filed on 8/29/2022)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to the Honorable Trina L. Thompson in the San Francisco division for all further proceedings. 1. All future filings shall bear the initials TLT immediately after the case number.2. All case management conference dates are vacated and will be reset by the Court. 3. All hearing dates presently scheduled are vacated. However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be renoticed for hearing before Judge Thompson by the moving party for a date consistent with the Courts law and motion calendar, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. 4. Deadlines for ADR compliance and discovery cutoff remain unchanged.5. All pretrial conference and trial dates currently set for or after November 15, 2022, and all other deadlines associated with the case, will remain in place unless otherwise ordered.6. All pretrial conference and trial dates scheduled on or before November 15, 2022, are vacated. Other pretrial deadlines (e.g., motions in limine, pretrial statements, proposed joint trial exhibits, etc.) will remain in place. The Court will notify the parties when a status conference will be held to schedule a new pretrial conference and trial dates for affected cases.7. Matters currently referred to a Magistrate Judge will remain before that Magistrate Judge absent further notice.8. On or before October 14, 2022, the parties shall file a Joint Case Management Conference Statement (separate statements are appropriate if either party is proceeding without counsel). The statement should not exceed ten pages in length and should address all issues outlined in the #Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District. The approved form for such statements can be accessed # here.IT IS SO ORDERED. Dated: 8/29/2022 FOR THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE Mark B. Busby, Clerk of Court (wsn-adi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2022)
August 22, 2022 Filing 22 STIPULATION to Extend the time for Defendant Philo, Inc. to Move to Dismiss or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Pursuant to L.R. 6.1 filed by Philo, Inc.. (Singh, David) (Filed on 8/22/2022)
August 15, 2022 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons and Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines served on Philo, Inc. on 8/2/2022, filed by James Newlands. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bates, Joseph) (Filed on 8/15/2022)
August 5, 2022 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE:You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference set for November 3, 2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. Case Management Statement due by October 27, 2022. All parties shall appear by videoconference using log-in instructions the Court will provide in advance. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2022)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case. Signed by Clerk on 08/05/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2022)
August 5, 2022 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2022)
August 5, 2022 Filing 17 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by James Newlands.. (Lowther, Edwin) (Filed on 8/5/2022)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Douglas I. Cuthbertson. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2022)
August 4, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17414381.) filed by James Newlands. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Cuthbertson, Douglas) (Filed on 8/4/2022)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Courtney Elizabeth Ross. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2022)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Edwin Lee Lowther III. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2022)
August 3, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17405630.) Filing fee previously paid on 8/2/22 filed by James Newlands. (Ross, Courtney) (Filed on 8/3/2022)
August 3, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17405563.) Filing fee previously paid on 8/2/22 filed by James Newlands. (Lowther, Edwin) (Filed on 8/3/2022)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: denying both applications because counsel failed to attach a certificate of good standing. re #8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice filed by James Newlands, #9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice filed by James Newlands Issued by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 8/3/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2022)
August 2, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17405630.) filed by James Newlands. (Ross, Courtney) (Filed on 8/2/2022)
August 2, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17405563.) filed by James Newlands. (Lowther, Edwin) (Filed on 8/2/2022)
July 29, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Sobol (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 7/29/2022)
July 26, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Philo, Inc.. (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2022)
July 26, 2022 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/20/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/27/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2022)
July 26, 2022 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Bates, Joseph) (Filed on 7/26/2022)
July 26, 2022 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/9/2022. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2022)
July 26, 2022 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by James Newlands . (Bates, Joseph) (Filed on 7/26/2022)
July 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17381261.). Filed byJames Newlands. (Bates, Joseph) (Filed on 7/25/2022)
July 25, 2022 #Electronic filing error. Civil Cover Sheet missing. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re: #1 Complaint filed by James Newlands (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newlands v. Philo, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Newlands
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Represented By: Courtney Elizabeth Ross
Represented By: Edwin Lee Lowther
Represented By: Douglas I. Cuthbertson
Represented By: Ian Bensberg
Represented By: Michael W. Sobol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philo, Inc.
Represented By: Blake Jacob Steinberg
Represented By: David Ramraj Singh
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?