Jimenez v. Horizon Actuarial Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Teresa Jimenez
Defendant: Horizon Actuarial Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv04550
Filed: August 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2022 Filing 24 REPLY (re #18 MOTION to Dismiss Transfer, or Stay Under the First-to-File Rule ) filed byHorizon Actuarial Services, LLC. (Vasquez, Bethany) (Filed on 9/28/2022)
September 28, 2022 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), Set/Reset Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Remand . Motion Hearing set for 10/13/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. (Related documents(s) #10 )(lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2022)
September 27, 2022 Filing 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #18 MOTION to Dismiss Transfer, or Stay Under the First-to-File Rule to extend Deadline for Defendant's Reply Brief filed by Horizon Actuarial Services, LLC. (Vasquez, Bethany) (Filed on 9/27/2022)
September 20, 2022 Filing 21 REPLY (re #10 MOTION to Remand ) filed byTeresa Jimenez. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 9/20/2022)
September 20, 2022 Filing 20 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #18 MOTION to Dismiss Transfer, or Stay Under the First-to-File Rule ) filed byTeresa Jimenez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of George R. Nemiroff)(Wynne, Edward) (Filed on 9/20/2022)
September 6, 2022 Filing 19 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #10 MOTION to Remand ) filed byHorizon Actuarial Services, LLC. (Vasquez, Bethany) (Filed on 9/6/2022)
September 6, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Transfer, or Stay Under the First-to-File Rule filed by Horizon Actuarial Services, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 10/13/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 9/20/2022. Replies due by 9/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark Lewis In Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, Transfer, or Stay, #2 Declaration of John J. Sullivan in Support of Defendants Motion to Dismiss, Transfer, or Stay, #3 Exhibits A-H in Support of Declaration of John J. Sullivan, #4 Proposed Order Granting Defendants Motion to Dismiss, Transfer, or Stay)(Vasquez, Bethany) (Filed on 9/6/2022) Modified on 9/7/2022 (slh, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to John J. Sullivan. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2022)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Max E. Kaplan. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2022)
August 29, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for John J. Sullivan with proposed order, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number ACANDC-17487653) filed by Horizon Actuarial Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for John J. Sullivan)(Sullivan, John) (Filed on 8/29/2022)
August 29, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Max E. Kaplan with proposed order, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number ACANDC-17487415) filed by Horizon Actuarial Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Max E. Kaplan)(Kaplan, Max) (Filed on 8/29/2022)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR REMAND. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/16/2022. (jdlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2022)
August 12, 2022 Filing 12 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR REMAND; NOTICE CONTINUING HEARING DATE re #10 MOTION to Remand filed by Horizon Actuarial Services, LLC. (Vasquez, Bethany) (Filed on 8/12/2022)
August 9, 2022 Filing 11 STIPULATION STIPULATION SETTING TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Horizon Actuarial Services, LLC. (Vasquez, Bethany) (Filed on 8/9/2022)
August 9, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand filed by Teresa Jimenez. Motion Hearing set for 9/15/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 8/23/2022. Replies due by 8/30/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wynne, Edward) (Filed on 8/9/2022)
August 9, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Bethany A. Vasquez (Vasquez, Bethany) (Filed on 8/9/2022)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 08/09/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2022)
August 8, 2022 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/31/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/7/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2022)
August 8, 2022 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2022)
August 8, 2022 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Teresa Jimenez.. (Wynne, Edward) (Filed on 8/8/2022)
August 8, 2022 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/22/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2022)
August 6, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Horizon Actuarial Services, LLC re #2 Certificate of Interested Entities,, #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet, and Notice of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding (Richman, Dina) (Filed on 8/6/2022)
August 5, 2022 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Horizon Actuarial Services, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Stephanie Patrick, Other Affiliate Stanley Goldfarb, Other Affiliate Cary Franklin, Other Affiliate Thomas Cliffel, Other Affiliate Kathleen Coda, Other Affiliate Mary Ann Tierney Dunleavy, Other Affiliate Mark K. Lewis, Other Affiliate Nathan H. Slaff, Other Affiliate Kevin Culp, Other Affiliate Gerald Crews, Other Affiliate Lewis Wade MacQuarrie for Horizon Actuarial Services, LLC. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Richman, Dina) (Filed on 8/5/2022)
August 5, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-22-600443. (Filing fee $402 receipt number CCANDC-17419581). Filed byHorizon Actuarial Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal, #4 Notice of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Richman, Dina) (Filed on 8/5/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jimenez v. Horizon Actuarial Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Jimenez
Represented By: Edward Joseph Wynne
Represented By: George Ryan Nemiroff
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horizon Actuarial Services, LLC
Represented By: Dina Rebecca Richman
Represented By: Bethany A. Vasquez
Represented By: John Joseph Sullivan
Represented By: Max E Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?