Cornet et al v. Twitter, Inc.
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Cornet, Justine De Caires, Grae Kindel, Alexis Camacho, Jessica Pan, Emily Kim, Miguel Andres Barreto and Brett Menzies Folkins
Defendant: Twitter, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv06857
Filed: November 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Referring Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704 Labor Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2023 Filing 65 NOTICE Regarding Twitter's Motion to Transfer Venue and/or Motion to Dismiss by Miguel Andres Barreto, Alexis Camacho, Emmanuel Cornet, Justine De Caires, Brett Menzies Folkins, Emily Kim, Grae Kindel, Jessica Pan re #56 Opposition/Response to Motion, #45 MOTION to Transfer Venue and/or Motion to Dismiss (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 4/13/2023)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER. The motion to transfer and/or dismiss, Dkt. No. 45, is suitable for decision without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b). The hearing set for February 23, 2023, is vacated. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/21/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2023)
February 8, 2023 Filing 63 Certificate of Interested Entities by Miguel Andres Barreto, Alexis Camacho, Emmanuel Cornet, Justine De Caires, Brett Menzies Folkins, Emily Kim, Grae Kindel, Jessica Pan (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 2/8/2023)
February 7, 2023 Filing 62 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Twitter, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent X Holdings I, Inc. for Twitter, Inc.. (Meckley, Eric) (Filed on 2/7/2023)
February 6, 2023 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Kassia Ann Stephenson for Twitter, Inc. (Stephenson, Kassia) (Filed on 2/6/2023)
February 3, 2023 Filing 60 REPLY (re #45 MOTION to Transfer Venue and/or Motion to Dismiss ) filed byTwitter, Inc.. (Meckley, Eric) (Filed on 2/3/2023)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER. The case management conference that was set for February 9, 2023, is vacated pending further order. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/3/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2023)
February 2, 2023 Filing 58 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Twitter, Inc.. (Meckley, Eric) (Filed on 2/2/2023)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/24/2023. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2023)
January 20, 2023 Filing 56 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #45 MOTION to Transfer Venue and/or Motion to Dismiss ) filed by Miguel Andres Barreto, Alexis Camacho, Emmanuel Cornet, Justine De Caires, Brett Menzies Folkins, Emily Kim, Grae Kindel, Jessica Pan. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 1/20/2023) Modified on 1/23/2023 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
January 20, 2023 Filing 55 RESPONSE re #53 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases by Twitter, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Relationship Between Cornet, et al. v. Twitter, Inc. and Rodriguez v. Twitter, Inc. and Pro Unlimited, Inc.)(Meckley, Eric) (Filed on 1/20/2023)
January 20, 2023 Filing 54 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/08/2022, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter Ruth Levine Ekhaus, RMR, RDR, FCRR, CSR No. 12219, telephone number (415)336-5223/ruth_ekhaus@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #50 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/20/2023. (Related documents(s) #50 ) (rre, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2023)
January 18, 2023 Filing 53 REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 1/18/2023. (rfm, COURT USER) (Filed on 1/18/2023)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER RE ARBITRATION. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/13/2023. (jdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2023)
January 11, 2023 Filing 51 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/8/2022 before Judge James Donato by Miguel Andres Barreto, Alexis Camacho, Emmanuel Cornet, Justine De Caires, Brett Menzies Folkins, Emily Kim, Grae Kindel, Jessica Pan, for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 1/11/2023)
January 10, 2023 Filing 50 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on December 8, 2022 before Judge James Donato by Twitter, Inc., for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (Meckley, Eric) (Filed on 1/10/2023)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER. The motion to compel arbitration, Dkt. No. 18, is suitable for decision without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b). The hearing that was set for January 12, 2023, is vacated. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/10/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2023)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR #45 TWITTER'S MOTION TO TRANSFER AND/OR MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/5/2023. (jdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2023)
December 30, 2022 Filing 47 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #45 MOTION to Transfer Case and/or Motion to Dismiss filed by Miguel Andres Barreto, Alexis Camacho, Emmanuel Cornet, Justine De Caires, Brett Menzies Folkins, Emily Kim, Grae Kindel, Jessica Pan. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 12/30/2022)
December 23, 2022 Filing 46 Request for Judicial Notice re #45 MOTION to Transfer Case and/or Motion to Dismiss filed byTwitter, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 2), #2 Exhibit A (Part 2 of 2), #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #45 ) (Meckley, Eric) (Filed on 12/23/2022)
December 23, 2022 Filing 45 MOTION to Transfer Case and/or Motion to Dismiss filed by Twitter, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/23/2023 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 1/6/2023. Replies due by 1/13/2023. (Meckley, Eric) (Filed on 12/23/2022)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER. For Dkt. No. 43, the joint proposed notice is approved. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/20/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2022)
December 19, 2022 Filing 43 RESPONSE re #42 Order Re: Notice by Miguel Andres Barreto, Alexis Camacho, Emmanuel Cornet, Justine De Caires, Brett Menzies Folkins, Emily Kim, Grae Kindel, Jessica Pan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 12/19/2022)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER RE LITIGATION NOTICE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/14/2022. (jdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2022)
December 12, 2022 Filing 41 REPLY (re #18 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Strike and/or Dismiss Class Claims ) filed byTwitter, Inc.. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 12/12/2022)
December 9, 2022 Filing 40 SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Twitter, Inc.. Filed by Jessica Pan, Justine De Caires, Emmanuel Cornet, Grae Kindel, Alexis Camacho, Emily Kim, Miguel Andres Barreto, Brett Menzies Folkins. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 12/9/2022)
December 9, 2022 Filing 39 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion Hearing held on December 8, 2022. (jdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/9/2022)
December 7, 2022 Filing 38 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #28 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint ) filed byTwitter, Inc.. (Meckley, Eric) (Filed on 12/7/2022)
December 5, 2022 Filing 37 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #18 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Strike and/or Dismiss Class Claims ) filed byAlexis Camacho, Emmanuel Cornet, Justine De Caires, Grae Kindel, Jessica Pan. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 12/5/2022)
December 5, 2022 Filing 36 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #34 Administrative Motion for the Court to Hear Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint Together with their Emergency Motion for Protective Order re #28 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint) filed by Twitter, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Meckley) (Meckley, Eric) (Filed on 12/5/2022) Modified on 12/9/2022 (gba, COURT STAFF).
December 5, 2022 Filing 35 CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), Set/Reset Deadlines as to #7 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order . Motion Hearing moved to 12/8/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2022)
December 5, 2022 Hearing set for 3:00 PM on December 8, 2022, reset for 1:30 PM per Dkt. No. 35. (jdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2022)
November 30, 2022 Filing 34 Administrative Motion for the Court to Hear Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint together with their Emergency Motion for Protective Order re #28 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Alexis Camacho, Emmanuel Cornet, Justine De Caires, Grae Kindel, Jessica Pan. Responses due by 12/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 11/30/2022)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER. For Dkt. No. 32, the Court grants a one-time exception to plaintiffs for an oversize reply brief. No further briefing by either side is permitted. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/28/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2022)
November 24, 2022 Filing 32 RESPONSE re #31 Objection by Alexis Camacho, Emmanuel Cornet, Justine De Caires, Grae Kindel, Jessica Pan. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 11/24/2022)
November 23, 2022 Filing 31 OBJECTIONS to re #30 Reply to Opposition/Response and Request to Strike Plaintiffs' Reply Brief by Twitter, Inc.. (Meckley, Eric) (Filed on 11/23/2022)
November 23, 2022 Filing 30 REPLY in support of (re #7 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order ) filed byAlexis Camacho, Emmanuel Cornet, Justine De Caires, Grae Kindel, Jessica Pan. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 11/23/2022)
November 23, 2022 Filing 29 Proposed Order re #28 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Alexis Camacho, Emmanuel Cornet, Justine De Caires, Grae Kindel, Jessica Pan. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 11/23/2022)
November 23, 2022 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Alexis Camacho, Emmanuel Cornet, Justine De Caires, Grae Kindel, Jessica Pan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Complaint) (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 11/23/2022) Modified on 11/25/2022 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER. Defendant Twitter's request to shorten time on the motion to compel arbitration, Dkt. No. 19, is denied. The motion will be heard on January 12, 2023, on the Court's regular civil calendar. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/23/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2022)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Thomas Cullen Wallace. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2022)
November 22, 2022 Filing 25 CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), Set/Reset Deadlines as to #18 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Strike and/or Dismiss Class Claims. Motion Hearing set for 12/29/2022 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2022)
November 22, 2022 Filing 24 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #19 MOTION to Shorten Time on Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Strike Class Claims ) filed byAlexis Camacho, Emmanuel Cornet, Justine De Caires, Grae Kindel, Jessica Pan. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 11/22/2022)
November 22, 2022 Filing 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17752588.) filed by Twitter, Inc.. (Wallace, Thomas) (Filed on 11/22/2022)
November 22, 2022 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing.Disregard filed in error. #18 )(lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2022) Modified on 11/22/2022 (lrc, COURT STAFF).
November 21, 2022 Filing 21 Request for Judicial Notice re #20 Opposition/Response to Motion for a Protective Order filed byTwitter, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 2), #2 Exhibit A (Part 2 of 2), #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #20 ) (Meckley, Eric) (Filed on 11/21/2022)
November 21, 2022 Filing 20 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #7 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order ) filed byTwitter, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stacey Fix Conti)(Meckley, Eric) (Filed on 11/21/2022)
November 21, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION to Shorten Time on Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Strike Class Claims filed by Twitter, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Meckley, #2 Proposed Order)(Meckley, Eric) (Filed on 11/21/2022)
November 21, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STRIKE AND/OR DISMISS CLASS CLAIMS Arbitration and Strike and/or Dismiss Class Claims filed by Twitter, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/29/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 12/5/2022. Replies due by 12/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Fidelma Callaghan, #2 Proposed Order)(Meckley, Eric) (Filed on 11/21/2022) Modified on 11/22/2022 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
November 21, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashlee Nicole Cherry for Defendant Twitter, Inc. (Cherry, Ashlee) (Filed on 11/21/2022)
November 21, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian D, Berry for Defendant Twitter, Inc. (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 11/21/2022)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. The parties' proposed briefing schedule on the protective order motion, Dkt. No. 14, is adopted with the understanding that Twitter will not seek employee releases pending further order. A hearing is set for December 8, 2022, at 3:00 p.m. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/18/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2022)
November 16, 2022 Filing 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER on Hearing Date and Reply Briefing on Plaintiffs Emergency Motion for Protective Order filed by Twitter, Inc.. (Meckley, Eric) (Filed on 11/16/2022)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. Defendant Twitter is directed to respond to the protective order motion, Dkt. No. 7, by November 21, 2022. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/14/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2022)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/9/2023 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 2/2/2023. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/14/2022. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2022)
November 10, 2022 Filing 11 Emergency MOTION to Shorten Time for Defendant's Response filed by Alexis Camacho, Emmanuel Cornet, Justine De Caires, Grae Kindel, Jessica Pan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 11/10/2022)
November 10, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jessica Pan, Grae Kindel, Justine De Caires, Emmanuel Cornet, Alexis Camacho. Twitter, Inc. served on 11/10/2022, answer due 12/1/2022. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 11/10/2022)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 11/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2022)
November 10, 2022 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2022)
November 9, 2022 Filing 7 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order filed by Alexis Camacho, Emmanuel Cornet, Justine De Caires, Grae Kindel, Jessica Pan. Responses due by 11/23/2022. Replies due by 11/30/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 11/9/2022) Modified on 11/10/2022 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
November 8, 2022 Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Twitter, Inc.. Filed by Jessica Pan, Grae Kindel, Justine De Caires, Emmanuel Cornet, Alexis Camacho. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 11/8/2022)
November 4, 2022 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/18/2022. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2022)
November 3, 2022 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 1/30/202 3. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/6/2023 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2022)
November 3, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Twitter, Inc.. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2022)
November 3, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 11/3/2022)
November 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Twitter, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17697119.). Filed by Jessica Pan, Grae Kindel, Justine De Caires, Emmanuel Cornet, Alexis Camacho. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 11/3/2022) Modified on 11/4/2022 (kmg, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cornet et al v. Twitter, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Cornet
Represented By: Shannon Liss-Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justine De Caires
Represented By: Shannon Liss-Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grae Kindel
Represented By: Shannon Liss-Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Camacho
Represented By: Shannon Liss-Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Pan
Represented By: Shannon Liss-Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Kim
Represented By: Shannon Liss-Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Andres Barreto
Represented By: Shannon Liss-Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Menzies Folkins
Represented By: Shannon Liss-Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twitter, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Meckley
Represented By: Ashlee Nicole Cherry
Represented By: Brian D, Berry
Represented By: Thomas Cullen Wallace
Represented By: Kassia Ann Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?