Rakuten USA, Inc. v. Expertisemais Servicos Contabeis E Administrativos LTDA et al
Plaintiff: Rakuten USA, Inc.
Defendant: Expertisemais Servicos Contabeis E Administrativos LTDA, Nexgenesis Holdings LTDA, Gencomm Financial Services Do Brasil LTDA, Gencomm Internet Services Do Brasil LTDA and Gencomm Logistics Services Do Brasil LTDA
Case Number: 3:2022cv07342
Filed: November 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Injunction
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2022 Filing 20 Refund Status re #19 Application for Refund Approved. (kep, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2022)
December 22, 2022 Filing 19 Application for Refund, Receipt Number ACANDC-17746057 by Rakuten USA, Inc.. (McMahon, Brien) (Filed on 12/22/2022)
December 21, 2022 Filing 18 Refund Status re #17 Application for Refund Declined. (kep, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2022)
December 8, 2022 Filing 17 Application for Refund, Receipt Number ACANDC-17746057 by Rakuten USA, Inc.. (McMahon, Brien) (Filed on 12/8/2022)
November 28, 2022 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rakuten USA, Inc. re #14 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (McMahon, Brien) (Filed on 11/28/2022)
November 28, 2022 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rakuten USA, Inc. re #13 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion (McMahon, Brien) (Filed on 11/28/2022)
November 28, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice by Rakuten USA, Inc. (McMahon, Brien) (Filed on 11/28/2022)
November 28, 2022 Filing 13 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order against Foreign-Country Ex Parte Asset Seizure Order Enforcement and Order to Show Cause (McMahon, Brien) (Filed on 11/28/2022)
November 23, 2022 Filing 12 Declaration of Brien F. McMahon Re Service of Order Re Motion for Provisional Relief and All Other Filed Materials filed by Rakuten USA, Inc.. (McMahon, Brien) (Filed on 11/23/2022) Modified on 11/23/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE MOTION FOR PROVISIONAL RELIEF. Signed by Judge William Alsup. (whalc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2022).
November 22, 2022 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Expertisemais Servicos Contabeis E Administrativos LTDA, Gencomm Financial Services Do Brasil LTDA, Gencomm Internet Services Do Brasil LTDA, Gencomm Logistics Services Do Brasil LTDA, Nexgenesis Holdings LTDA. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2022)
November 22, 2022 Filing 9 FEE PAID (Filing fee$402,receipt number ACANDC-17752381). (McMahon, Brien) (Filed on 11/22/2022)
November 22, 2022 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Entities by Rakuten USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Rakuten Group, Inc. for Rakuten USA, Inc.. (McMahon, Brien) (Filed on 11/22/2022)
November 22, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brien Francis McMahon (McMahon, Brien) (Filed on 11/22/2022)
November 22, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Against Foreign-Country Ex Parte Asset Seizure Order Enforcement and Order to Show Cause filed by Rakuten USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Verified Complaint, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Declaration of Brien F. McMahon In Support and Certifying Notice of Motion Provided to Defendants)(McMahon, Brien) (Filed on 11/22/2022)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 11/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2022)
November 22, 2022 #Electronic filing error. Filing fee not paid. Please pay the filing fee through Pay.gov by clicking on Civil > Other Documents > New Case Filing Fee in CM/ECF. [err701] Re:[ 1] Complaint, filed by Rakuten USA, Inc. (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2022)
November 22, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Against Foreign-Country Ex Parte Asset Seizure Order Enforcement and Order to Show Cause. Responses due by 11/28/2022 at 12:00 noon. Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2022 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. (afm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2022)
November 21, 2022 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2022)
November 21, 2022 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Rakuten USA, Inc... (McMahon, Brien) (Filed on 11/21/2022)
November 21, 2022 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/5/2022. (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2022)
November 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants(Filing Fee $402.00 Receipt No. ACANDC-17752381). Filed by Rakuten USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons)(McMahon, Brien) (Filed on 11/21/2022) Modified on 11/22/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rakuten USA, Inc. v. Expertisemais Servicos Contabeis E Administrativos LTDA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rakuten USA, Inc.
Represented By: Brien Francis McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Expertisemais Servicos Contabeis E Administrativos LTDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nexgenesis Holdings LTDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gencomm Financial Services Do Brasil LTDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gencomm Internet Services Do Brasil LTDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gencomm Logistics Services Do Brasil LTDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?