Anne Arundel County, Maryland v. McKinsey and Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Anne Arundel County, Maryland
Defendant: McKinsey and Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv07523
Filed: November 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2022 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Maryland; Case Number 1:22-cv-02916. Case file, copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 12/1/2022 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MDL Certified Transfer ORDER transferring case to the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Maryland Unassigned on 11/29/2022. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING Show Cause Hearing re: #5 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 11/30/2022. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 30, 2022 MEMBER CASE OPENED re MDL 2996: From District of Maryland, 1:22cv02916, Anne Arundel County, Maryland v. McKinsey and Company, Inc., Opened in California Northern District as 3:22-cv-07523-CRB pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 35 cc: JPMDL (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2022)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing Anne Arundel County, Maryland to show cause for failure to comply with #Standing Order 2019-07. Show Cause Hearing set for 12/30/2022 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before the Chambers Judge. This Order shall be vacated if Anne Arundel County, Maryland files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 11/28/2022. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 10, 2022 Filing 4 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by Anne Arundel County, Maryland was filed missing information. **Please file Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Summons to #1 Complaint. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 11/10/2022. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 10, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner. Anne Arundel County, Maryland or counsel for Anne Arundel County, Maryland are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 11/25/2022. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 10, 2022 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner. (kos, Deputy Clerk)
November 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10263267.), filed by Anne Arundel County Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Keller, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anne Arundel County, Maryland v. McKinsey and Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Arundel County, Maryland
Represented By: Amy E. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey and Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?