Murphy et al v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Mark Murphy and Whitney Murphy
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2022cv07527
Filed: November 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2022 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff Mark Murphy et al.] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 12/1/2022)
December 1, 2022 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff Mark Murphy et al.] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 12/1/2022)
December 1, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand [RE: Plaintiff Mark Murphy et al.] by Monsanto Company. (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 12/1/2022)
November 30, 2022 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:22-cv-02875. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 30, 2022 MEMBER CASE OPENED re MDL 2741: From District of Minnesota, 0:22-cv-02875, Murphy et al v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:22-cv-07527-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 362 cc: JPML (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2022)
November 28, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-362) transferring case to the Northern District of California per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge Vince Chhabria.(kt)
November 10, 2022 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice to JPML regarding case potentially related to MDL #2741 re: #1 Complaint. (MMP)
November 10, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (MMP)
November 10, 2022 Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Katherine M. Menendez per 3rd 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 22-cv-2875 (KMM/DTS).Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MMP)
November 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9884719) filed by Mark Murphy, Whitney Murphy. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Zimmerman, Genevieve)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy et al v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Murphy
Represented By: Genevieve M. Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whitney Murphy
Represented By: Genevieve M. Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Jennise Walker-Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?