County of Greer v. Juul Labs, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: County of Greer
Defendant: Juul Labs, Inc., Altria Group, Inc., Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Philip Morris USA, Inc., James Monsees, Adam Bowen, Nicholas Pritzker, Hoyoung Huh, Riaz Valani and Juul Labs, Inc. formerly doing business as PAX Labs, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv07537
Filed: November 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by County of Greer. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service, #7 Certificate/Proof of Service, #8 Certificate/Proof of Service, #9 Certificate/Proof of Service, #10 Certificate/Proof of Service, #11 Certificate/Proof of Service, #12 Certificate/Proof of Service, #13 Certificate/Proof of Service, #14 Certificate/Proof of Service, #15 Certificate/Proof of Service, #16 Certificate/Proof of Service, #17 Certificate/Proof of Service, #18 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Shinoff, William) (Filed on 12/21/2022)
December 1, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Adam Bowen, Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Hoyoung Huh, James Monsees, Juul Labs, Inc., Nicholas Pritzker, Philip Morris USA, Inc., Riaz Valani. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2022)
December 1, 2022 Filing 4 REDACTED AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed by County of Greer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix)(Shinoff, William) (Filed on 12/1/2022) Modified on 12/1/2022 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
December 1, 2022 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge William H. Orrick. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2022)
December 1, 2022 DIRECT MEMBER CASE OPENED re MDL 2913. Opened in California Northern District as 3:22-cv-07537-WHO County of Greer v. Juul Labs, Inc. et al cc: JPMDL (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2022)
November 30, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Shinoff, William) (Filed on 11/30/2022)
November 30, 2022 Filing 1 REDACTED COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17772598.). Filed byCounty of Greer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix)(Shinoff, William) (Filed on 11/30/2022) Modified on 12/1/2022 (ecg, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Greer v. Juul Labs, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Greer
Represented By: William B. Shinoff
Represented By: James Patrick Frantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juul Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Client Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Group Distribution Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Morris USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Monsees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoyoung Huh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riaz Valani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juul Labs, Inc. formerly doing business as PAX Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?