McKay v. Juul Labs, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tiauane McKay
Defendant: JUUL Labs, Inc., Altria Group, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc., Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Enterprises LLC, James Monsees, Adam Bowen, Nicholas Pritzker, Hoyoung Huh, Riaz Valani, Mother Murphys Labs, Inc., Alternative Ingredients, Inc., Tobacco Technology, Inc., Eliquitech, Inc., McLane Company, Inc., Eby-Brown Company, LLC, Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc. and Juul Labs, Inc. formerly doing business as PAX Labs, Inc. formerly doing business as Ploom Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv07577
Filed: December 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tiauane McKay. Adam Bowen served on 12/19/2022, answer due 1/9/2023; Alternative Ingredients, Inc. served on 12/19/2022, answer due 1/9/2023; Altria Client Services LLC served on 12/19/2022, answer due 1/9/2023; Altria Enterprises LLC served on 12/19/2022, answer due 1/9/2023; Altria Group Distribution Company served on 12/19/2022, answer due 1/9/2023; Altria Group, Inc. served on 12/19/2022, answer due 1/9/2023; Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc. served on 12/19/2022, answer due 1/9/2023; Eby-Brown Company, LLC served on 12/19/2022, answer due 1/9/2023; Eliquitech, Inc. served on 12/19/2022, answer due 1/9/2023; Hoyoung Huh served on 12/19/2022, answer due 1/9/2023; James Monsees served on 12/19/2022, answer due 1/9/2023; Juul Labs, Inc. served on 12/19/2022, answer due 1/9/2023; McLane Company, Inc. served on 12/19/2022, answer due 1/9/2023; Mother Murphys Labs, Inc. served on 12/19/2022, answer due 1/9/2023; Nicholas Pritzker served on 12/19/2022, answer due 1/9/2023; Philip Morris USA, Inc. served on 12/19/2022, answer due 1/9/2023; Riaz Valani served on 12/19/2022, answer due 1/9/2023. (O'Neill, Alicia) (Filed on 12/21/2022)
December 9, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Adam Bowen, Alternative Ingredients, Inc., Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Enterprises LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc., Eby-Brown Company, LLC, Eliquitech, Inc., Hoyoung Huh, James Monsees, Juul Labs, Inc., McLane Company, Inc., Mother Murphys Labs, Inc., Nicholas Pritzker, Philip Morris USA, Inc., Riaz Valani, Tobacco Technology, Inc. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2022)
December 6, 2022 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (O'Neill, Alicia) (Filed on 12/6/2022)
December 1, 2022 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge William H. Orrick. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2022)
December 1, 2022 Filing 1 SHORT-FORM COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Adam Bowen, Alternative Ingredients, Inc., Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Enterprises LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc., Eby-Brown Company, LLC, Eliquitech, Inc., Hoyoung Huh, JUUL Labs, Inc., James Monsees, McLane Company, Inc., Mother Murphys Labs, Inc., Nicholas Pritzker, Philip Morris USA, Inc., Riaz Valani, Tobacco Technology, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17777041.). Filed by Tiauane McKay. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Neill, Alicia) (Filed on 12/1/2022)
December 1, 2022 DIRECT MEMBER CASE OPENED re MDL 2913: Opened in California Northern District as 3:22-cv-07577-WHO McKay v. JUUL Labs, Inc. et al cc: JPMDL (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKay v. Juul Labs, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiauane McKay
Represented By: Alicia Danielle O'Neill
Represented By: Mikal C. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUUL Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Morris USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Client Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Group Distribution Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Enterprises LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Monsees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoyoung Huh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riaz Valani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mother Murphys Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alternative Ingredients, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tobacco Technology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eliquitech, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McLane Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eby-Brown Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juul Labs, Inc. formerly doing business as PAX Labs, Inc. formerly doing business as Ploom Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?