Mirkooshesh et al v. Elie et al
Plaintiff: Hamid Mirkooshesh and Jackeline Mirkooshesh
Defendant: Mehrdad Elie, Eliecorp and Mehrdad Elie, as Trustee of the Mehrdad Elie 2006 Revocable Trust
Not Classified By Court: Mojgan Kavianinejad
Case Number: 3:2022cv07615
Filed: December 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Hamid Mirkooshesh.. (Estavillo, Jason) (Filed on 1/10/2023)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. Incorrect case number listed on document. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please correct and re-file in its entirety. Re: #14 Cons ent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge filed by Hamid Mirkooshesh (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2023)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Hamid Mirkooshesh.. (Estavillo, Jason) (Filed on 1/9/2023)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 1/2 3/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2023)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Hamid Mirkooshesh, Jackeline Mirkooshesh. Service waived by Mehrdad Elie, as Trustee of the Mehrdad Elie 2006 Revocable Trust waiver sent on 12/6/2022, answer due 2/6/2023. (Estavillo, Jason) (Filed on 12/21/2022)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Hamid Mirkooshesh, Jackeline Mirkooshesh. Service waived by Mehrdad Elie waiver sent on 12/6/2022, answer due 2/6/2023. (Estavillo, Jason) (Filed on 12/21/2022)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Hamid Mirkooshesh, Jackeline Mirkooshesh. Service waived by Hamid Mirkooshesh waiver sent on 12/6/2022, answer due 2/6/2023; Jackeline Mirkooshesh waiver sent on 12/6/2022, answer due 2/6/2023. (Estavillo, Jason) (Filed on 12/21/2022)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 1/3/2 023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2022)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Lien (Lien Claimant Mojgan Kavianinejad's (as to Contra Costa County Superior Court Case No. MSD18-03910) by Mojgan Kavianinejad (Emblidge, G.) (Filed on 12/8/2022)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Lien (Lien Claimant Mojgan Kavianinejad's (as to Contra Costa County Superior Court Case No. MSD18-03401) by Mojgan Kavianinejad (Emblidge, G.) (Filed on 12/8/2022)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Civil Cover Sheet by Hamid Mirkooshesh, Jackeline Mirkooshesh Amended. (Estavillo, Jason) (Filed on 12/5/2022)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Mehrdad Elie, Mehrdad Elie, as Trustee of the Mehrdad Elie 2006 Revocable Trust, Eliecorp. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2022)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/24/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/3/2023 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2022)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Hamid Mirkooshesh, Jackeline Mirkooshesh Amended. (Estavillo, Jason) (Filed on 12/2/2022)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/16/2022. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2022)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants (Filing fee $402, receipt number BCANDC-17781000). Filed by Hamid Mirkooshesh, Jackeline Mirkooshesh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Estavillo, Jason) (Filed on 12/2/2022)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. Missing Signature. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #3 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Jackeline Mirkooshesh, Hamid Mirkooshesh. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mirkooshesh et al v. Elie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hamid Mirkooshesh
Represented By: Jason W. Estavillo
Represented By: Allison Cecchini Erggelet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackeline Mirkooshesh
Represented By: Jason W. Estavillo
Represented By: Allison Cecchini Erggelet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mehrdad Elie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eliecorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mehrdad Elie, as Trustee of the Mehrdad Elie 2006 Revocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Mojgan Kavianinejad
Represented By: G. Scott Emblidge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?