School Board of Leon County v. JUUL Labs, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: School Board of Leon County
Defendant: JUUL Labs, Inc., James Monsees, Adam Bowen, Nicholas Pritzker, Hoyoung Huh, Riaz Valani, Altria Group, Inc., Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company and Philip Morris USA, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv08879
Filed: December 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by School Board of Leon County. Adam Bowen served on 12/27/2022, answer due 1/17/2023; Altria Client Services LLC served on 12/27/2022, answer due 1/17/2023; Altria Group Distribution Company served on 12/27/2022, answer due 1/17/2023; Altria Group, Inc. served on 12/27/2022, answer due 1/17/2023; Hoyoung Huh served on 12/27/2022, answer due 1/17/2023; JUUL Labs, Inc. served on 12/27/2022, answer due 1/17/2023; James Monsees served on 12/27/2022, answer due 1/17/2023; Nicholas Pritzker served on 12/27/2022, answer due 1/17/2023; Philip Morris USA, Inc. served on 12/27/2022, answer due 1/17/2023; Riaz Valani served on 12/27/2022, answer due 1/17/2023. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Executed, #2 Summons Returned Executed, #3 Summons Returned Executed, #4 Summons Returned Executed, #5 Summons Returned Executed, #6 Summons Returned Executed, #7 Summons Returned Executed, #8 Summons Returned Executed, #9 Summons Returned Executed)(Cartmell, Thomas) (Filed on 1/10/2023)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #3 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal per MDL Dkt. No. 1277. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2023)
December 22, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Adam Bowen, Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Hoyoung Huh, JUUL Labs, Inc., James Monsees, Nicholas Pritzker, Philip Morris USA, Inc., Riaz Valani. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2022)
December 22, 2022 DIRECT MEMBER CASE OPENED RE: 3:19-md-02913-WHO. Opened in California Northern District as 22-cv-08879-WHO cc: JPMDL (ecg-adi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2022)
December 14, 2022 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge William H. Orrick. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2022)
December 14, 2022 Filing 3 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by School Board of Leon County. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A - Redacted Complaint, #4 Exhibit B - Unredacted Complaint)(Cartmell, Thomas) (Filed on 12/14/2022)
December 14, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Cartmell, Thomas) (Filed on 12/14/2022)
December 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Adam Bowen, Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Hoyoung Huh, JUUL Labs, Inc., James Monsees, Nicholas Pritzker, Philip Morris USA, Inc., Riaz Valani ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17822210.). Filed bySchool Board of Leon County. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cartmell, Thomas) (Filed on 12/14/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: School Board of Leon County v. JUUL Labs, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: School Board of Leon County
Represented By: Thomas Phillip Cartmell
Represented By: Jonathan P. Kieffer
Represented By: Tyler W. Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUUL Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Monsees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoyoung Huh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riaz Valani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Client Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Group Distribution Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Morris USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?