Mitchell v. Yochum
Plaintiff: Henry Moses Mitchell, Jr.
Defendant: K Yochum
Case Number: 3:2023cv00461
Filed: February 1, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC MWD
Referring Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION and Request for Ruling to Effect Service filed by Henry Moses Mitchell, Jr. Responses due by 4/12/2023. Replies due by 4/26/2023. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2023)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RESPONSE re #2 Clerk's Notice re: IFP, by Henry Moses Mitchell, Jr. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2023)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 411017750. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2023)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 3/13/2023. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against K Yochum (Filing fee NOT PAID.). Filed by Henry Moses Mitchell, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Yochum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Moses Mitchell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Yochum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?