Pons et al v. Walter Kidde Portable Equipment Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Pons, Caroline Coleman and Stanley Wolken
Defendant: Walter Kidde Portable Equipment Inc., BRK Brands, Inc., Walter Kidde Portable Equipment Inc. doing business as Kidde Safety Equipment and BRK Brands, Inc. doing business as First Alert
Case Number: 3:2023cv03436
Filed: July 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Maxine M Chesney
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Alison K. Van Horn is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 5, 2023. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2023)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Michael K. Ross is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 5, 2023. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2023)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Renotice motion hearing re #31 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18608461.) filed byStephen Pons. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Related document(s) #31 ) (Van Horn, Alison) (Filed on 9/1/2023)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18608461.) filed by Stephen Pons. (Van Horn, Alison) (Filed on 9/1/2023)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18608274.) filed by Stephen Pons. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Ross, Michael) (Filed on 9/1/2023)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Scott Kitner is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 30, 2023. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2023)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Martin Woodward is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 30, 2023. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2023)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18597063.) filed by Caroline Coleman, Stephen Pons, Stanley Wolken. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Kitner, Scott) (Filed on 8/29/2023)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18595974.) filed by Caroline Coleman, Stephen Pons, Stanley Wolken. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert. of Good Standing)(Woodward, Martin) (Filed on 8/29/2023)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE. The application of Devin S. Anderson is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 23, 2023. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2023)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE. The application of K. Winn Allen is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 23, 2023. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2023)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DENYING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO DEEM CASES RELATED. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/22/2023. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2023)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stephen Pons re #16 Case Management Scheduling Order, (Eskovitz, Sean) (Filed on 8/14/2023)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Devin S. Anderson ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18542423.) filed by Walter Kidde Portable Equipment Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Anderson, Devin) (Filed on 8/14/2023)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for K. Winn Allen ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18542309.) filed by Walter Kidde Portable Equipment Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Allen, K. Winn) (Filed on 8/14/2023)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Entities by Walter Kidde Portable Equipment Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Carrier Global Corporation, Other Affiliate Walter Kidde Portable Equipment, Inc., Other Affiliate Kidde Fire Protection Inc., Other Affiliate Carrier Fire & Security Americas Corp., Other Affiliate Kidde US Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Carrier Fire & Security Corporation for Walter Kidde Portable Equipment Inc.. (Esser, Michael) (Filed on 8/14/2023)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Walter Kidde Portable Equipment Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Carrier Global Corporation, Other Affiliate Walter Kidde Portable Equipment, Inc., Other Affiliate Kidde Fire Protection Inc., Other Affiliate Carrier Fire & Security Americas Corp., Other Affiliate Kidde US Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Carrier Fire & Security Corporation for Walter Kidde Portable Equipment Inc.. (Esser, Michael) (Filed on 8/14/2023)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Phillip Esser on behalf of Walter Kidde Portable Equipment, Inc. d/b/a Kidde Safety Equipment (Esser, Michael) (Filed on 8/14/2023)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/20/2023 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor.Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/13/2023. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 8/11/2023. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2023)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 08/08/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2023)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2023)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by BRK Brands, Inc... (Herrington, Robert) (Filed on 8/7/2023)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Stephen Pons. Service waived by BRK Brands, Inc. waiver sent on 7/18/2023, answer due 9/18/2023. (Eskovitz, Sean) (Filed on 7/26/2023)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Stephen Pons. Service waived by Walter Kidde Portable Equipment Inc. waiver sent on 7/18/2023, answer due 9/18/2023. (Eskovitz, Sean) (Filed on 7/26/2023)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Stephen Pons.. (Eskovitz, Sean) (Filed on 7/24/2023)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/5/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/12/2023 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2023)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Issued as to BRK Brands, Inc., Walter Kidde Portable Equipment Inc.. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2023)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/26/2023. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2023)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Eskovitz, Sean) (Filed on 7/12/2023)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Eskovitz, Sean) (Filed on 7/12/2023)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. ONLY ONE SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED PER CASE, USE AN ATTACHMENT TO SUMMONS IF NEEDED TO LIST ADDITIONAL DEFENDANTS INFORMATION. Please list both Defendants information on ONE summons, not two separate ones. [err201]This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #5 Proposed Summons filed by Stephen Pons (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2023)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Eskovitz, Sean) (Filed on 7/11/2023)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error.ONLY ONE SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED PER CASE, USE AN ATTACHMENT TO SUMMONS IF NEEDED TO LIST ADDITIONAL DEFENDANTS INFORMATION [err201]. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by Stephen Pons, #3 Proposed Summons filed by Stephen Pons (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2023)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order *Nature of Suite updated, please disregard* #Electronic filing error. Nature of Suit on civil cover sheet does not match what was chosen in ECF. Please clarify/respond to clerks email. No judge assignment will be made until corrected.This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: #1 Complaint filed by Stephen Pons (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2023) Modified on 7/12/2023 (ark, COURT STAFF).
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. ONLY ONE SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED PER CASE, USE AN ATTACHMENT TO SUMMONS IF NEEDED TO LIST ADDITIONAL DEFENDANTS INFORMATION [err201]. Document #4 was submitted with 2 summons with the same Defendants name. Please list both defendants information on ONE summons. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #4 Proposed Summons filed by Stephen Pons (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2023)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Eskovitz, Sean) (Filed on 7/10/2023)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Eskovitz, Sean) (Filed on 7/10/2023)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18435787.). Filed byStephen Pons. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit)(Eskovitz, Sean) (Filed on 7/10/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pons et al v. Walter Kidde Portable Equipment Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Pons
Represented By: Sean Eskovitz
Represented By: Michael Kay Ross
Represented By: Alison Van Horn
Represented By: Martin Darren Woodward
Represented By: Scott Andrew Kitner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline Coleman
Represented By: Sean Eskovitz
Represented By: Martin Darren Woodward
Represented By: Scott Andrew Kitner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Wolken
Represented By: Sean Eskovitz
Represented By: Martin Darren Woodward
Represented By: Scott Andrew Kitner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Kidde Portable Equipment Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRK Brands, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Kidde Portable Equipment Inc. doing business as Kidde Safety Equipment
Represented By: Devin Scott Anderson
Represented By: K. Winn Allen
Represented By: Michael Phillip Esser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRK Brands, Inc. doing business as First Alert
Represented By: Robert James Herrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?