L. et al v. Alphabet Inc. et al
Plaintiff: J. L., C. B., P. M., N. G., R. F., J. D., G. R. and K. S.
Defendant: Alphabet Inc., Google DeepMind and Google LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv03440
Filed: July 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: Araceli Martinez-Olguin
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants Alphabet Inc. and Google DeepMind by C. B., J. D., R. F., N. G., J. L., P. M., G. R., K. S. (Hart, Yana) (Filed on 9/19/2023)
September 15, 2023 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Alphabet Inc., Google DeepMind, Google LLC. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 9/15/2023)
August 4, 2023 Filing 11 STIPULATION Setting Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by Alphabet Inc., Google DeepMind, Google LLC. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 8/4/2023)
July 18, 2023 Filing 10 Clerk's Notice Scheduling Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 10/19/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2023 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ads, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2023)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 7/18/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2023)
July 18, 2023 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2023)
July 17, 2023 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by C. B., J. D., R. F., N. G., J. L., P. M., G. R., K. S... (Clarkson, Ryan) (Filed on 7/17/2023)
July 12, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Alphabet Inc., Google DeepMind, Google LLC. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2023)
July 12, 2023 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/5/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/12/2023 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2023)
July 11, 2023 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/25/2023. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2023)
July 11, 2023 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by C. B., J. D., R. F., N. G., J. L., P. M., G. R., K. S. . (Clarkson, Ryan) (Filed on 7/11/2023)
July 11, 2023 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Clarkson, Ryan) (Filed on 7/11/2023)
July 11, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alphabet Inc., Google DeepMind, Google LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18437386.). Filed byJ. D., P. M., G. R., C. B., N. G., J. L., R. F., K. S.. (Clarkson, Ryan) (Filed on 7/11/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: L. et al v. Alphabet Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. L.
Represented By: Ryan J. Clarkson
Represented By: Tiara Avaness
Represented By: Tracey B. Cowan
Represented By: Valter Malkhasyan
Represented By: Yana A. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. B.
Represented By: Ryan J. Clarkson
Represented By: Tiara Avaness
Represented By: Tracey B. Cowan
Represented By: Valter Malkhasyan
Represented By: Yana A. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P. M.
Represented By: Ryan J. Clarkson
Represented By: Tiara Avaness
Represented By: Yana A. Hart
Represented By: Tracey B. Cowan
Represented By: Valter Malkhasyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N. G.
Represented By: Ryan J. Clarkson
Represented By: Tiara Avaness
Represented By: Tracey B. Cowan
Represented By: Valter Malkhasyan
Represented By: Yana A. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. F.
Represented By: Ryan J. Clarkson
Represented By: Tiara Avaness
Represented By: Tracey B. Cowan
Represented By: Valter Malkhasyan
Represented By: Yana A. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. D.
Represented By: Ryan J. Clarkson
Represented By: Tiara Avaness
Represented By: Tracey B. Cowan
Represented By: Valter Malkhasyan
Represented By: Yana A. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. R.
Represented By: Ryan J. Clarkson
Represented By: Tiara Avaness
Represented By: Tracey B. Cowan
Represented By: Valter Malkhasyan
Represented By: Yana A. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. S.
Represented By: Ryan J. Clarkson
Represented By: Tiara Avaness
Represented By: Valter Malkhasyan
Represented By: Yana A. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alphabet Inc.
Represented By: David H. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google DeepMind
Represented By: David H. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Represented By: David H. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?