Magaris v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Maria A. Magaris
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi and SSA (INTERESTED PARTY / NEF)
Case Number: 3:2023cv04282
Filed: August 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #10 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answer. Deadline for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended from 10/21/2023 to 11/20/2023.(ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2023)
October 16, 2023 Filing 10 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Kilolo Kijakazi, Maria A. Magaris. (Thornton-Millard, Angela) (Filed on 10/16/2023) Modified on 10/17/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2023 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kilolo Kijakazi.. (Thornton-Millard, Angela) (Filed on 9/19/2023)
September 7, 2023 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Maria A. Magaris.. (Soroushian, Vishtasp) (Filed on 9/7/2023)
September 7, 2023 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 9/21/2023. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2023)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED ORDER re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 08/24/2023. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2023)
August 23, 2023 Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2023)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE ECF #6 *** Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2023) Modified on 8/24/2023 (ejk, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2023 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/5/2023. (bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2023)
August 22, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Maria A. Magaris. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Soroushian, Vishtasp) (Filed on 8/22/2023)
August 22, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Judicial Review of Decision of Commissioner against Kilolo Kijakazi. Filed byMaria A. Magaris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Soroushian, Vishtasp) (Filed on 8/22/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Magaris v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria A. Magaris
Represented By: Vishtasp Mehr Soroushian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Angela Thornton-Millard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSA (INTERESTED PARTY / NEF)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?