McAuliffe v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Coco Joliana McAuliffe
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi and SSA (INTERESTED PARTY / NEF)
Case Number: 3:2023cv04478
Filed: August 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Lisa J Cisneros
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2023 Filing 9 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time filed by Kilolo Kijakazi. (Highland, Erin) (Filed on 10/26/2023)
September 27, 2023 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kilolo Kijakazi.. (Highland, Erin) (Filed on 9/27/2023)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Lisa J. Cisneros granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2023)
September 14, 2023 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Coco Joliana McAuliffe.. (Benavides, Francesco) (Filed on 9/14/2023)
September 14, 2023 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 9/28/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2023)
August 31, 2023 Filing 4 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2023)
August 30, 2023 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/13/2023. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2023)
August 30, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Coco Joliana McAuliffe. (Benavides, Francesco) (Filed on 8/30/2023)
August 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security. Filed byCoco Joliana McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Benavides, Francesco) (Filed on 8/30/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McAuliffe v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coco Joliana McAuliffe
Represented By: Francesco Paulo Benavides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Erin Highland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSA (INTERESTED PARTY / NEF)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?