Ramos v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Lisa Ramos
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi and SSA (INTERESTED PARTY / NEF)
Case Number: 3:2023cv04712
Filed: September 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1383 Review of HHS Decision
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2023 Filing 10 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to File the Certified Administrative Record filed by Kilolo Kijakazi and Lisa Ramos. (Vieira, Christopher) (Filed on 11/8/2023) Modified on 11/9/2023 (anj, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR PARTIES TO MEET AND CONFER RE: STATEMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 10/26/2023. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2023)
October 26, 2023 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lisa Ramos.. (Sackett, Harvey) (Filed on 10/26/2023)
October 12, 2023 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 10/26/2023. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2023)
October 12, 2023 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kilolo Kijakazi.. (Vieira, Christopher) (Filed on 10/12/2023)
September 14, 2023 Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER: (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2023)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2023)
September 14, 2023 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/28/2023. (bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2023)
September 13, 2023 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Lisa Ramos. (Sackett, Harvey) (Filed on 9/13/2023)
September 13, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Judicial Review of Decision of Commissioner of Social Security against Kilolo Kijakazi. Filed by Lisa Ramos. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sackett, Harvey) (Filed on 9/13/2023) Modified on 9/14/2023 (anj, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramos v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Ramos
Represented By: Harvey Peter Sackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Christopher Davide Vieira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSA (INTERESTED PARTY / NEF)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?