Antillon v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Simone Antillon
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi and SSA (INTERESTED PARTY / NEF)
Case Number: 3:2023cv05223
Filed: October 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1383 Review of HHS Decision
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2023 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kilolo Kijakazi.. (Highland, Erin) (Filed on 11/3/2023)
November 1, 2023 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Simone Antillon.. (Sackett, Harvey) (Filed on 11/1/2023)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2023)
October 13, 2023 Filing 4 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER: (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2023)
October 12, 2023 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2023)
October 12, 2023 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Simone Antillon. (Sackett, Harvey) (Filed on 10/12/2023)
October 12, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Judicial Review of Decision of Commissioner of Social Security against Kilolo Kijakazi. Filed bySimone Antillon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sackett, Harvey) (Filed on 10/12/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antillon v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simone Antillon
Represented By: Harvey Peter Sackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Erin Highland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSA (INTERESTED PARTY / NEF)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?