Doe v. Becerra
Case Number: 3:2023cv05925
Filed: February 8, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1395 HHS: Adverse Reimbursement Review

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Order As Modified by Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros granting 31 Notice of Settlement and Request to Continue Deadlines. Status Report due by 10/17/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/24/2024 at 01:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only.(bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order by Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros granting 29 Stipulation re Response Date.(ljclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER Signed by Judge Lisa J. Cisneros on 6/14/2024. Status Report due by 8/15/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2024 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order by Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros granting 25 Stipulation re Response Date. Defendant's Response due by 7/3/2024.(bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
February 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order As Modified by Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros granting 18 STIPULATION RE RESPONSE DATE, PROCEDURAL ORDER, AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Defendant's Response due by 6/3/2024. Joint Status Report due by 6/13/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/20/2024 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only.(bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?