Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida Inc. et al v. Jazz Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida Inc and Health Options Inc.
Defendant: Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Jazz Pharmaceuticals Public Limited Company, Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC, Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Hikma Labs Inc. and Eurohealth (USA), Inc.
Case Number: 3:2024cv00514
Filed: January 29, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1337 Sherman-Clayton Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2024 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 3:23-cv-01453. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 29, 2024 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Florida Middle, 3:23-cv-01453,, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida Inc. et al v. Jazz Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al, Opened in California Northern District as 3:24-cv-00514-RS cc: JPMDL (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2024)
January 26, 2024 Filing 13 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Northern District of California. MDL case number: 2966 (MDC)
January 8, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TPL)
January 5, 2024 Filing 11 SUMMONS issued as to Eurohealth (USA) Inc., HIKMA Labs Inc., HIKMA Pharmaceuticals PLC, HIKMA Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Jazz Pharmaceuticals Inc., Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Jazz Pharmaceuticals Public Limited Company. (AJS)
January 5, 2024 Filing 10 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida Inc. (Renstrom, Laura) Modified on 1/5/2024 to edit docket text (AJS).
January 5, 2024 Filing 9 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida Inc. (Renstrom, Laura) Modified on 1/5/2024 to edit docket text (AJS).
January 5, 2024 Filing 8 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida Inc. (Renstrom, Laura) Modified on 1/5/2024 to edit docket text (AJS).
January 5, 2024 Filing 7 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida Inc. (Renstrom, Laura) Modified on 1/5/2024 to edit docket text (AJS).
January 5, 2024 Filing 6 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida Inc. (Renstrom, Laura) Modified on 1/5/2024 to edit docket text (AJS).
January 5, 2024 Filing 5 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida Inc. (Renstrom, Laura) Modified on 1/5/2024 to edit docket text (AJS).
January 5, 2024 Filing 4 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida Inc. (Renstrom, Laura) Modified on 1/5/2024 to edit docket text (AJS).
December 12, 2023 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:23-cv-01453-HES-PDB. (TRF)
December 12, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Todd M. Schneider, Matthew, Jason H. Kim, J. Caleigh Macdonald, S. Weiler, Peter D. St. Phillip, Uriel Rabinovitz and Noelle Ruggiero of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TRF)
December 11, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21550783) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Renstrom, Laura) Modified on 12/12/2023 (LD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida Inc. et al v. Jazz Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida Inc
Represented By: J. Caleigh Macdonald
Represented By: Jason H. Kim
Represented By: Matthew Sinclair Weiler
Represented By: Noelle Ruggiero
Represented By: Peter St. Phillip, Jr.
Represented By: Peter D St. Phillip
Represented By: Todd M. Schneider
Represented By: Uriel Rabinovitz
Represented By: Laura Renstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Health Options Inc.
Represented By: J. Caleigh Macdonald
Represented By: Jason H. Kim
Represented By: Matthew Sinclair Weiler
Represented By: Noelle Ruggiero
Represented By: Peter St. Phillip, Jr.
Represented By: Todd M. Schneider
Represented By: Uriel Rabinovitz
Represented By: Laura Renstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jazz Pharmaceuticals Public Limited Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Labs Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eurohealth (USA), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?