Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's v. S Cue Transportation LLC et al
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's
Defendant: S Cue Transportation LLC and All Coast Logistics USA, LLC
Case Number: 3:2024cv00523
Filed: January 26, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 49 U.S.C. ยง 81 Damaged Goods While Being Transported
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2024 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by S Cue Transportation LLC. (Gavigan, Lindsay) (Filed on 3/14/2024)
March 14, 2024 Filing 18 Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to S Cue Transportation LLC, All Coast Logistics USA, LLC (Related documents(s) #17 , #16 )(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2024)
March 13, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant S Cue Transportation LLC filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert S. Crowder, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Crowder, Robert) (Filed on 3/13/2024)
March 13, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant All Coast Logistics USA, LLC filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert S. Crowder, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Crowder, Robert) (Filed on 3/13/2024)
February 14, 2024 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's. S Cue Transportation LLC served on 2/12/2024, answer due 3/4/2024. (Crowder, Robert) (Filed on 2/14/2024)
February 14, 2024 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's. All Coast Logistics USA, LLC served on 2/12/2024, answer due 3/4/2024. (Crowder, Robert) (Filed on 2/14/2024)
February 8, 2024 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference is reset for 5/2/2024 at 1:30 p.m. before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by a Zoom webinar. Joint Case Management Statement is due by 4/25/2024. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at JSCcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than noon on 5/1/2024.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2024)
February 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 2/8/2024. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2024)
February 8, 2024 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2024)
February 8, 2024 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's.. (Crowder, Robert) (Filed on 2/8/2024)
January 29, 2024 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to S Cue Transportation LLC. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2024)
January 29, 2024 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to All Coast Logistics USA, LLC. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2024)
January 29, 2024 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/18/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2024 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2024)
January 26, 2024 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/9/2024. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2024)
January 26, 2024 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Crowder, Robert) (Filed on 1/26/2024)
January 26, 2024 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Crowder, Robert) (Filed on 1/26/2024)
January 26, 2024 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's identifying Corporate Parent Munich Re for Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's. (Crowder, Robert) (Filed on 1/26/2024)
January 26, 2024 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's . (Crowder, Robert) (Filed on 1/26/2024)
January 26, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19066170.). Filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Crowder, Robert) (Filed on 1/26/2024)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's v. S Cue Transportation LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's
Represented By: Robert Schiller Crowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Cue Transportation LLC
Represented By: Lindsay Gavigan
Represented By: E Susie Mendoza
Represented By: Holly Gagas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Coast Logistics USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?