Ner v. O'Malley
Plaintiff: Maria Ner
Defendant: Martin J. O'Malley
Interested Party: SSA (INTERESTED PARTY / NEF)
Case Number: 3:2024cv02086
Filed: April 5, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Lisa J Cisneros
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2024 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Martin J. O'Malley.. (Highland, Erin) (Filed on 4/22/2024)
April 8, 2024 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Maria Ner.. (Benavides, Francesco) (Filed on 4/8/2024)
April 8, 2024 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER: (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2024)
April 8, 2024 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/22/2024. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2024)
April 5, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Martin J. O'Malley ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19295989.). Filed by Maria Ner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Benavides, Francesco) (Filed on 4/5/2024)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ner v. O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Ner
Represented By: Francesco Paulo Benavides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin J. O'Malley
Represented By: Erin Highland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA (INTERESTED PARTY / NEF)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?