Greist et al v. LendUS, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Barbara Greist, Susan Schell and Melanie Green
Defendant: LendUS, LLC and CrossCountry Mortgage, LLC
Case Number: 3:2024cv02411
Filed: April 23, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: Araceli Martinez-Olguin
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: In light of the filing of the amended complaint #19 , the pending motion to dismiss #18 is TERMINATED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin on June 17, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amolc1, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2024)
June 14, 2024 Filing 19 Amended Collective and Class Action Complaint (with jury demand) against All Defendants. Filed by Barbara Greist, Susan Schell, Melanie Green. (Galdston, Benjamin) (Filed on 6/14/2024) Modified on 6/17/2024 (kmm2, COURT STAFF).
May 31, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CrossCountry Mortgage, LLC. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 10/24/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor. Responses due by 6/14/2024. Replies due by 6/21/2024. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thomas, Dominique) (Filed on 5/31/2024)
May 24, 2024 Filing 17 Clerk's Notice of ENTRY OF DEFAULT Against Defendant LendUS, LLC. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Related documents(s) #16 )(kmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2024)
May 17, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant LendUS, LLC filed by Barbara Greist, Susan Schell. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin Galdston #2 [Proposed] Entry of Default (Galdston, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/17/2024) Modified on 5/20/2024 (kmm2, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2024 Filing 15 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage, LLC to Respond To Complaint Pursuant To Local Rule 6-11(a) And Toll Claim filed by CrossCountry Mortgage, LLC. (Thomas, Dominique) (Filed on 5/16/2024) Modified on 5/17/2024 (kmm2, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2024 Filing 14 Clerk's Notice on Reassignment. You are noticed that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Martinez-Olguin's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/martinez-olguin-araceli-amo/. This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 8/22/2024 no later than 12:00 PM PST. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/29/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ads, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2024)
May 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 05/09/2024. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2024)
May 9, 2024 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2024)
May 8, 2024 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Barbara Greist, Susan Schell.. (Galdston, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/8/2024)
May 8, 2024 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 5/22/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2024)
April 30, 2024 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Barbara Greist, Susan Schell re #6 Summons Issued (Galdston, Benjamin) (Filed on 4/30/2024)
April 30, 2024 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Barbara Greist, Susan Schell re #5 Summons Issued (Galdston, Benjamin) (Filed on 4/30/2024)
April 24, 2024 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 7/18/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/25/2024, 11:00 AM in San Francisco - via Zoom. (kmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2024)
April 24, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to CrossCountry Mortgage, LLC. (kmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2024)
April 24, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to LendUS, LLC. (kmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2024)
April 23, 2024 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Galdston, Benjamin) (Filed on 4/23/2024)
April 23, 2024 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/7/2024. (wsm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2024)
April 23, 2024 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Galdston, Benjamin) (Filed on 4/23/2024)
April 23, 2024 Filing 1 Collective Action COMPLAINT (with jury demand) for Violations of the Fair Labor Standards Act against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19346714.). Filed by Barbara Greist, Susan Schell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Galdston, Benjamin) (Filed on 4/23/2024) Modified on 4/24/2024 (kmm2, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greist et al v. LendUS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Greist
Represented By: Benjamin Galdston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Schell
Represented By: Benjamin Galdston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Green
Represented By: Benjamin Galdston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LendUS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CrossCountry Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Dominique N. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?